EP3290434 - PEPTIDE HAVING ANTI-DIABETIC AND ANTI-OBESITY EFFECTS, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Caregen Co., Ltd. 46-38 LS-ro 91beon-gil Dongan-gu Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 431-848 / KR | [2018/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUNG, Yong Ji 101-1202 Sungdong Maeul LG Village 1Cha Apt. 86 Seongbok 2-ro Suji-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 448-980 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Eun Mi 105-1103 Beodeulchi Maeul Kyoungnam Honors Ville 2 Cha Apt. 11 Seongbok 1-ro 163beon-gil Suji-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 448-739 / KR | [2018/10] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2018/10] | Application number, filing date | 15890803.8 | 12.05.2015 | [2018/10] | WO2015KR04749 | Priority number, date | KR20150059648 | 28.04.2015 Original published format: KR 20150059648 | [2018/10] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016175362 | Date: | 03.11.2016 | Language: | KO | [2016/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3290434 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3290434 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/06, A61K38/08, A61P3/00, A61P3/06, A61P3/10, A61K38/30, A61K38/22 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
A61K38/08 (EP,US);
C12N5/10 (IL);
C07K7/06 (US);
A61K38/2264 (EP,US);
A61K38/30 (EP,US);
A61K39/395 (IL);
A61P3/00 (EP,US);
A61P3/04 (EP,US);
A61P3/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/16] | C07K7/06, A61K38/08, A61P3/00, A61P3/06, A61P3/10 | ||
Former IPC [2018/10] | C07K7/06, A61K38/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PEPTID MIT ANTIDIABETISCHER WIRKUNG UND WIRKUNG GEGEN FETTLEIBIGKEIT SOWIE VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2018/10] | English: | PEPTIDE HAVING ANTI-DIABETIC AND ANTI-OBESITY EFFECTS, AND USE THEREOF | [2018/10] | French: | PEPTIDE AYANT DES EFFETS ANTI-DIABÉTIQUES ET ANTI-OBÉSITÉ, ET SON UTILISATION | [2018/10] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2017 | Translation filed | 10.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/10] | 10.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19199355.9 / EP3613758 | EP19199388.0 / EP3613759 | EP19199390.6 / EP3613760 | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.05.2015 | AL | 19.08.2020 | AT | 19.08.2020 | CY | 19.08.2020 | CZ | 19.08.2020 | DK | 19.08.2020 | EE | 19.08.2020 | FI | 19.08.2020 | HR | 19.08.2020 | LT | 19.08.2020 | LV | 19.08.2020 | MC | 19.08.2020 | MK | 19.08.2020 | MT | 19.08.2020 | PL | 19.08.2020 | RO | 19.08.2020 | RS | 19.08.2020 | SE | 19.08.2020 | SI | 19.08.2020 | SK | 19.08.2020 | SM | 19.08.2020 | TR | 19.08.2020 | BG | 19.11.2020 | NO | 19.11.2020 | GR | 20.11.2020 | IS | 19.12.2020 | PT | 21.12.2020 | IE | 12.05.2021 | LU | 12.05.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 12.05.2015 | |
AL | 19.08.2020 | ||
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CY | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
MK | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
TR | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
IE | 12.05.2021 | ||
LU | 12.05.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 12.05.2015 | |
AL | 19.08.2020 | ||
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CY | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
MK | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
IE | 12.05.2021 | ||
LU | 12.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 12.05.2015 | |
AL | 19.08.2020 | ||
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CY | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
IE | 12.05.2021 | ||
LU | 12.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 12.05.2015 | |
AL | 19.08.2020 | ||
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
IE | 12.05.2021 | ||
LU | 12.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
IE | 12.05.2021 | ||
LU | 12.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
LU | 12.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
MC | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SI | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SK | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 19.08.2020 | |
AT | 19.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 19.08.2020 | |
CZ | 19.08.2020 | ||
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
SM | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 19.08.2020 | |
DK | 19.08.2020 | ||
EE | 19.08.2020 | ||
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RO | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | DK | 19.08.2020 | |
FI | 19.08.2020 | ||
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
HR | 19.08.2020 | ||
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
LV | 19.08.2020 | ||
PL | 19.08.2020 | ||
RS | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
IS | 19.12.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
GR | 20.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
SE | 19.08.2020 | ||
BG | 19.11.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | ||
PT | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 19.08.2020 | |
LT | 19.08.2020 | ||
NO | 19.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9308826 (CEPHALON INC [US]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document * * sequence 19 * * page 6, lines 14-15 * [A] 8-16; | [Y]WO02069232 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [XA]US6693076 (LEWIS MICHAEL E [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *[A] 8-16; | [Y]WO2007087468 (CHILDRENS HOSP MEDICAL CENTER [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [XA]WO2007102686 (CAREGEN CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-7 * the whole document * * example 3 * [A] 8-16; | [Y]WO2007141309 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2014052451 (UNIV INDIANA RES & TECH CORP [US]) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * * sequence 5 * * claims 1, 5 *; | [Y] - UJIIE HIDETOSHI ET AL, "Identification of amino-terminal region of adiponectin as a physiologically functional domain", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY, WILEY-LISS INC, US, (20060501), vol. 98, no. 1, doi:10.1002/JCB.20779, ISSN 0730-2312, pages 194 - 207, XP002476528 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jcb.20779 | International search | [A]US6087334 (BEELEY NIGEL ROBERT ARNOLD [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * See the entire document. *; | [A]US2014018291 (VIGNATI LOUIS [US], et al) [A] 1-14* See the entire document. *; | [A]KR20140027594 (CGK BIO INC [KR]) [A] 1-14 * See the entire document. *; | [A]KR20140134083 (CAREGEN CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * See abstract; claims 1-9, 16, 17; table 1. *; | [A] - Genbank, (20070620), Database accession no. EDL89718.1, XP055326499 [A] 1-14 * See the entire document. * | [A] - Genbank, (20090305), Database accession no. ABG01984.1, XP055326501 [A] 1-14 * See the entire document. * |