EP3391647 - METHOD, APPARATUS, AND NON-TRANSITORY COMPUTER READABLE MEDIUM FOR GENERATING DEPTH MAPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | [2018/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Xingxing No.9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
ZHAO, Jibo No.9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2023/44] |
Former [2018/43] | 01 /
ZHAO, Xingxing No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | ||
02 /
ZHAO, Jibo No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2018/43] | Application number, filing date | 15891414.3 | 18.12.2015 | [2018/43] | WO2015CN97882 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017101108 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3391647 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3391647 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00, H04N13/139, H04N13/271, H04N13/128 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
H04N13/139 (EP,US);
H04N13/395 (CN);
H04N13/128 (US);
G06F3/01 (US);
H04N13/239 (CN);
H04N13/271 (CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/43] | H04N13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND NICHTTRANSITORISCHES COMPUTERLESBARES MEDIUM ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON TIEFENKARTEN | [2018/43] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS, AND NON-TRANSITORY COMPUTER READABLE MEDIUM FOR GENERATING DEPTH MAPS | [2018/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL, ET SUPPORT NON TRANSITOIRE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR, APTES À GÉNÉRER DES CARTES DE PROFONDEUR | [2018/43] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2016 | Search fee paid | 17.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2016 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 17.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.11.2023 | CZ | 01.11.2023 | DK | 01.11.2023 | EE | 01.11.2023 | ES | 01.11.2023 | HR | 01.11.2023 | IT | 01.11.2023 | LT | 01.11.2023 | LV | 01.11.2023 | MC | 01.11.2023 | NL | 01.11.2023 | PL | 01.11.2023 | RO | 01.11.2023 | RS | 01.11.2023 | SE | 01.11.2023 | SK | 01.11.2023 | SM | 01.11.2023 | LU | 18.12.2023 | BG | 01.02.2024 | NO | 01.02.2024 | GR | 02.02.2024 | IS | 01.03.2024 | PT | 01.03.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
CZ | 01.11.2023 | ||
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
IT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RO | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SK | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
CZ | 01.11.2023 | ||
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RO | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 01.11.2023 | |
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 02.02.2024 | |
IS | 01.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2013194255 (LEE SEOK [KR], et al) [Y] 2,7,12 * paragraph [0062]; figure 1 *; | [XY]US2014002604 (OHBA AKIO [JP], et al) [X] 1,6,11 * paragraphs [0021] , [0027] , [0043] , [0072] , [0098]; figures 2-3 * [Y] 2,3,7,8,12,13; | [Y]US2014055446 (CORRAL-SOTO EDUARDO R [CA]) [Y] 3,8,13* paragraphs [0005] , [0024] * | International search | [A]US2010309287 (RODRIGUEZ TONY F [US]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2012236114 (CHANG TE-HAO [TW], et al) [Y] 1-18 * description, paragraphs [0020]-[0032] *; | [Y]US2013162912 (CHANG TE-HAO [TW]) [Y] 1-18 * description, paragraphs [0015]-[0018] *; | [A]WO2013191689 (IMAGE MASTERS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-18* the whole document * | by applicant | US2014002604 |