EP3291487 - METHOD FOR PROCESSING VIRTUAL MACHINE CLUSTER AND COMPUTER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2020 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2018/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Xiangping Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LI, Long Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2018/10] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2018/10] | Application number, filing date | 15891701.3 | 26.11.2015 | [2018/10] | WO2015CN95654 | Priority number, date | CN201510244239 | 14.05.2015 Original published format: CN201510244239 | [2018/10] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016180005 | Date: | 17.11.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3291487 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3291487 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, H04L12/40, H04L12/26 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
H04L12/12 (EP);
H04L67/10 (CN);
H04L41/12 (US);
G06F11/1438 (EP);
G06F11/1484 (EP);
G06F11/203 (EP);
H04L12/40 (US);
H04L41/00 (US);
H04L41/0654 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2018/10] | H04L12/24, H04L12/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG EINES CLUSTERS AUS VIRTUELLEN MASCHINEN UND COMPUTERSYSTEM | [2018/10] | English: | METHOD FOR PROCESSING VIRTUAL MACHINE CLUSTER AND COMPUTER SYSTEM | [2018/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE GROUPE DE MACHINES VIRTUELLES ET SYSTÈME INFORMATIQUE | [2018/10] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2017 | Translation filed | 28.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/10] | 28.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.11.2015 | AL | 02.10.2019 | AT | 02.10.2019 | CY | 02.10.2019 | CZ | 02.10.2019 | DK | 02.10.2019 | EE | 02.10.2019 | ES | 02.10.2019 | FI | 02.10.2019 | HR | 02.10.2019 | IT | 02.10.2019 | LT | 02.10.2019 | LV | 02.10.2019 | MC | 02.10.2019 | MK | 02.10.2019 | MT | 02.10.2019 | NL | 02.10.2019 | PL | 02.10.2019 | RO | 02.10.2019 | RS | 02.10.2019 | SE | 02.10.2019 | SI | 02.10.2019 | SK | 02.10.2019 | SM | 02.10.2019 | TR | 02.10.2019 | IE | 26.11.2019 | LU | 26.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | FR | 02.12.2019 | BG | 02.01.2020 | GB | 02.01.2020 | NO | 02.01.2020 | GR | 03.01.2020 | IS | 02.02.2020 | PT | 03.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 26.11.2015 | |
AL | 02.10.2019 | ||
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CY | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
MT | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
TR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IE | 26.11.2019 | ||
LU | 26.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 02.12.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GB | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/35] | HU | 26.11.2015 | |
AL | 02.10.2019 | ||
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CY | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
MT | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
IE | 26.11.2019 | ||
LU | 26.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 02.12.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GB | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 26.11.2015 | |
AL | 02.10.2019 | ||
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CY | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
MT | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
IE | 26.11.2019 | ||
LU | 26.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GB | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 26.11.2015 | |
AL | 02.10.2019 | ||
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CY | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
IE | 26.11.2019 | ||
LU | 26.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GB | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CY | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
IE | 26.11.2019 | ||
LU | 26.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GB | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
IE | 26.11.2019 | ||
LU | 26.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GB | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
IE | 26.11.2019 | ||
LU | 26.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GB | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
IE | 26.11.2019 | ||
LU | 26.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
LU | 26.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
LU | 26.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
LU | 26.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
LU | 26.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 02.10.2019 | |
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 02.10.2019 | |
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 02.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO2011156932 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [Y] 8,17 * abstract * * page 13, line 4 - line 12 * [A] 1-7,9-16,18; | [Y]WO2012016175 (SYMANTEC CORP [US]) [Y] 3-5,12-14 * abstract ** paragraph [0027] *; | [XY]US2015120887 (HU YAN YAN [CN], et al) [X] 1,9,10,18 * abstract * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0063]; figures 3-5 * [Y] 3-5,8,12-14,17 | International search | [A]CN102110071 (INSPUR BEIJING ELECT INF IND) [A] 1-24 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN102455951 (STANDARD SOFTWARE CO LTD) [A] 1-24 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN103201724 (SYMANTEC CORP) [A] 1-24* , the whole document *; | [X]CN104601622 (IBM) [X] 1-24 * , description, paragraph [0004], and figure 4 * |