EP3303088 - VEHICLE MONITORING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEIA Inc. 2440 Sand Hill Road, Suite 100 Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2020/23] |
Former [2018/15] | For all designated states LEIA Inc. 2440 Sand Hill Road, Suite 303 Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FATTAL, David A. LEIA INC. 2440 Sand Hill Rd. Ste. 303 Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2018/15] | Application number, filing date | 15894424.9 | 30.05.2015 | [2018/15] | WO2015US33432 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016195647 | Date: | 08.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3303088 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3303088 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60W50/14, B60W40/02, G08G1/16 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
B60Q9/008 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06V20/64 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G08G1/165 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B60W40/02 (US);
B60K35/00 (US);
B60K35/211 (EP,US);
B60W50/14 (US);
G01S17/08 (US);
G01S17/931 (US);
G06T19/20 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06T7/521 (US);
G06V20/56 (US);
G06V20/58 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G08G1/0962 (EP,KR,US);
G08G1/166 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G08G1/167 (EP,KR,US);
H04N13/207 (EP,US);
H04N13/302 (EP,US);
B60R2300/105 (US);
B60W2050/146 (US);
G02B27/30 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM | [2018/15] | English: | VEHICLE MONITORING SYSTEM | [2018/15] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SUIVIT DE VÉHICULE | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 16.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.05.2015 | AL | 24.06.2020 | AT | 24.06.2020 | CY | 24.06.2020 | CZ | 24.06.2020 | DK | 24.06.2020 | EE | 24.06.2020 | FI | 24.06.2020 | HR | 24.06.2020 | LT | 24.06.2020 | LV | 24.06.2020 | MC | 24.06.2020 | MK | 24.06.2020 | NL | 24.06.2020 | PL | 24.06.2020 | RO | 24.06.2020 | RS | 24.06.2020 | SE | 24.06.2020 | SI | 24.06.2020 | SK | 24.06.2020 | SM | 24.06.2020 | BG | 24.09.2020 | NO | 24.09.2020 | GR | 25.09.2020 | IS | 24.10.2020 | PT | 26.10.2020 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/30] | HU | 30.05.2015 | |
AL | 24.06.2020 | ||
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CY | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 30.05.2015 | |
AL | 24.06.2020 | ||
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
MC | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SI | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
DK | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
PL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SK | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
IS | 24.10.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
AT | 24.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2020 | ||
EE | 24.06.2020 | ||
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RO | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
SM | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
PT | 26.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 24.06.2020 | |
FI | 24.06.2020 | ||
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
NL | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
BG | 24.09.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
RS | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
HR | 24.06.2020 | ||
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
LV | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
GR | 25.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 24.06.2020 | |
LT | 24.06.2020 | ||
SE | 24.06.2020 | ||
NO | 24.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 24.06.2020 | |
NO | 24.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008161997 (WENGELNIK HEINO [DE], et al) [A] 6-9,13-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009091667 (SCHULTZ JOHN C [US], et al) [A] 6-9,13-15 * paragraph [0051] ** paragraph [0074] *; | [X]US2010117812 (LAUBINGER LORENZ [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10-12 * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0045] *; | [X]JP2011070593 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [X] 1-5,10-12 * paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0016] *; | [X]US2012075878 (SATO JUN [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,10-12 * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0069] *; | [A]US2015036068 (FATTAL DAVID A [US], et al) [A] 6-9,13-15 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0051] *; | [A]US2015054636 (SANGORRIN JORGE SANS [DE], et al) [A] 1-5,10-12 * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039] * * claim 20 * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0048] *; | [A] - NORA BROY ET AL, "3D Displays in Cars : Exploring the User Performance for a Stereoscopic Instrument Cluster", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 6TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON AUTOMOTIVE USER INTERFACES AND INTERACTIVE VEHICULAR APPLICATIONS, AUTOMOTIVEUI '14, New York, New York, USA, (20140101), doi:10.1145/2667317.2667319, ISBN 978-1-4503-3212-5, pages 1 - 9, XP055531444 [A] 6-9,13-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2667317.2667319 | International search | [XY]JP2006252389 (AISIN SEIKI) [X] 1-3, 6, 11, 17 * See abstract, paragraphs [0021]-[0024], [0030]-[0047], and figures 1-12. * [Y] 4-5, 7-10, 12-16 , 18-20; | [A]US2011242102 (HESS WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1-20 * See abstract, paragraphs [0018]-[0024], and figure 1. *; | [A]JP2014229102 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-20* See abstract, paragraphs [0027]-[0034], and figures 1-3. *; | [Y]US2015036068 (FATTAL DAVID A [US], et al) [Y] 7-10, 12-16, 18-20 * See paragraphs [0051]-[0056] and figure 4. *; | [Y]US2015116481 (TROY JAMES J [US], et al) [Y] 4-5 * See abstract, paragraphs [0020]-[0021], [0029]-[0033], and figures 1, 3. * | by applicant | US2010117812 | JP2011070593 | US2012075878 |