EP3318837 - TOOL-SHAPE MEASUREMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIG DAISHOWA CO., LTD. 3-39, Nishi-ishikiricho 3-chome Higashiosaka-shi, Osaka 579-8013 / JP | [2020/29] |
Former [2018/19] | For all designated states Big Daishowa Co., Ltd. 3-39, Nishi-ishikiricho 3-chome Higashiosaka-shi Osaka 5798013 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAUCHI Masataka c/o BIG DAISHOWA CO., LTD. 3-39 Nishi-ishikiricho 3-chome Higashiosaka-shi Osaka 579-8013 / JP | 02 /
UEMURA Kouichi c/o BIG DAISHOWA CO., LTD. 3-39 Nishi-ishikiricho 3-chome Higashiosaka-shi Osaka 579-8013 / JP | 03 /
OOHASHI Reina c/o BIG DAISHOWA CO., LTD. 3-39 Nishi-ishikiricho 3-chome Higashiosaka-shi Osaka 579-8013 / JP | 04 /
KUMASAKI Shunsuke c/o BIG DAISHOWA CO., LTD. 3-39 Nishi-ishikiricho 3-chome Higashiosaka-shi Osaka 579-8013 / JP | 05 /
FUNASHOKU Akihito c/o BIG DAISHOWA CO., LTD. 3-39 Nishi-ishikiricho 3-chome Higashiosaka-shi Osaka 579-8013 / JP | [2018/19] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/29] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2018/19] | Hofmann, Andreas, et al RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 33 02 11 80062 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15897113.5 | 30.06.2015 | [2018/19] | WO2015JP68760 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017002186 | Date: | 05.01.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3318837 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3318837 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/24, B23Q17/22, B23Q17/24, G01B11/00, G01B11/28 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
B23Q17/2457 (EP,US);
B23Q17/22 (US);
B23Q17/24 (US);
B23Q17/2485 (EP,US);
G01B11/00 (EP,US);
G01B11/002 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/19] | G01B11/24, B23Q17/22, B23Q17/24, G01B11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WERKZEUGFORMMESSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/19] | English: | TOOL-SHAPE MEASUREMENT DEVICE | [2018/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE FORME D'OUTIL | [2018/19] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2017 | Translation filed | 29.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/19] | 28.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2015 | AL | 15.07.2020 | AT | 15.07.2020 | CY | 15.07.2020 | CZ | 15.07.2020 | DK | 15.07.2020 | EE | 15.07.2020 | ES | 15.07.2020 | FI | 15.07.2020 | HR | 15.07.2020 | LT | 15.07.2020 | LV | 15.07.2020 | MC | 15.07.2020 | MK | 15.07.2020 | MT | 15.07.2020 | NL | 15.07.2020 | PL | 15.07.2020 | RO | 15.07.2020 | RS | 15.07.2020 | SI | 15.07.2020 | SK | 15.07.2020 | SM | 15.07.2020 | TR | 15.07.2020 | BG | 15.10.2020 | GR | 16.10.2020 | IS | 15.11.2020 | PT | 16.11.2020 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 30.06.2015 | |
AL | 15.07.2020 | ||
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
MK | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
TR | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 30.06.2015 | |
AL | 15.07.2020 | ||
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
MK | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 30.06.2015 | |
AL | 15.07.2020 | ||
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 15.07.2020 | |
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 15.07.2020 | |
LT | 15.07.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19528376 (DASLER HANS ULRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * figure 2 * * column 1, lines 3-5, 29-32 * * column 2, lines 48-59 * * column 3, lines 54-64 *; | [A]DE10153581 (HEILIG & SCHWAB GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0001] , [00 2] , [00 5] - [0011] *; | [A]JP2008082748 (YAMATAKE CORP) [A] 1-5 * figures 3-5 *; | [A]JP2012086350 (MAKINO MILLING MACHINE) [A] 1-5* figure 9 *; | [A]US2013176429 (KURAHASHI YASUHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-5 * figure 9 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0 30] , [0 35] , [0 61] - [0066] * | International search | [A]JPH06109440 (MAKINO FURAISU SEIKI KK) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2005052910 (MAKINO FRAES SEIKI KK) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2006110680 (FUKOKU KK) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2008304292 (KYUSHU INST TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2012086350 (MAKINO MILLING MACHINE) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2013/0176429 A1 & EP 2631032 A1 *; | [A]JP2012108037 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP, et al) [A] 1-5* , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2013174549 (INST NAT COLLEGES TECH JAPAN, et al) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) * |