EP3318739 - CONTROL METHOD AND CONTROL DEVICE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [2018/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Eiji c/o NISSAN MOTOR Co. Ltd. Intellectual Property Department 1-1 Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | [2018/19] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2018/19] | Application number, filing date | 15897181.2 | 02.07.2015 | [2018/19] | WO2015JP69094 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017002254 | Date: | 05.01.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3318739 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3318739 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F02D23/00, F02D15/02, F02D41/04, F02D41/14, F02D41/10 | [2018/34] | CPC: |
F02D41/0007 (EP,RU,US);
F01L13/0026 (RU,US);
F02D23/005 (KR,RU,US);
F02D15/02 (EP,KR,RU,US);
F02B75/048 (RU,US);
F02D19/0673 (RU,US);
F02D23/00 (EP,RU,US);
F02D41/04 (EP,KR,RU,US);
F02D41/045 (EP,RU,US);
F02D41/10 (EP,RU,US);
F02D41/1454 (EP,RU,US);
F02D2200/602 (EP,US);
F02D31/005 (US);
F02D41/0052 (US);
F02D41/3035 (US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/19] | F02D23/00, F02D15/02, F02D41/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | [2018/19] | English: | CONTROL METHOD AND CONTROL DEVICE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2018/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2020/14] |
Former [2018/19] | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2018 | Translation filed | 15.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 15.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/19] | 15.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.07.2015 | AL | 17.06.2020 | AT | 17.06.2020 | CY | 17.06.2020 | CZ | 17.06.2020 | DK | 17.06.2020 | EE | 17.06.2020 | ES | 17.06.2020 | FI | 17.06.2020 | HR | 17.06.2020 | IT | 17.06.2020 | LT | 17.06.2020 | LV | 17.06.2020 | MC | 17.06.2020 | MK | 17.06.2020 | MT | 17.06.2020 | NL | 17.06.2020 | PL | 17.06.2020 | RO | 17.06.2020 | RS | 17.06.2020 | SE | 17.06.2020 | SI | 17.06.2020 | SK | 17.06.2020 | SM | 17.06.2020 | TR | 17.06.2020 | IE | 02.07.2020 | LU | 02.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | BG | 17.09.2020 | NO | 17.09.2020 | GR | 18.09.2020 | IS | 17.10.2020 | PT | 19.10.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 02.07.2015 | |
AL | 17.06.2020 | ||
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CY | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
MT | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
TR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IE | 02.07.2020 | ||
LU | 02.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
IE | 02.07.2020 | ||
LU | 02.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
IE | 02.07.2020 | ||
LU | 02.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 17.06.2020 | |
NO | 17.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4492203 (YUTAKA OTOBE [JP]); | [A]JPS60230524 (MAZDA MOTOR); | JPS63150048U [ ]; | [A]US2004112310 (OSAMURA KENSUKE [JP], et al); | [A]JP2005155507 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]US2005171670 (YOSHIOKA YOUKO [JP], et al); | [I]JP2008002328 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [I]US2008190406 (AKIHISA DAISUKE [JP], et al); | [A]JP2011051542 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [IA]WO2014046059 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD [JP]); | [A]WO2014057534 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al); | US2015219024 [ ] (KURASHIMA YOSHIKUNI [JP]); | US2015260113 [ ] (TANAKA HIROYUKI [JP]) | International search | [YA]JP2005155507 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]JP2007162592 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [YA]JP2008002328 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) |