EP3321092 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ACHIEVING DOCUMENT SECURITY BY GENERATING MULTIPLE REFLEXIVE AND TRANSMISSIVE LATENT IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2023 [2023/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universidad Politécnica de Madrid C/ Ramiro de Maeztu 7 28040 Madrid / ES | For all designated states Alise Devices, S.L. Calle Sierra Nevada 47 28691 Villanueva de la Canada (Madrid) / ES | [2018/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUINTANA ARREGUI, Patxi, Xabier Universidad Politecnica de Madrid Ramiro de Maeztu 7 28040 Madrid / ES | 02 /
ANDREAS GEDAY, Morten Universidad Politecnica de Madrid Ramiro de Maeztu 7 28040 Madrid / ES | 03 /
OTÓN SÁNCHEZ, José, Manuel Universidad Politecnica de Madrid Ramiro de Maeztu 7 28040 Madrid / ES | 04 /
CERROLAZA MARTINEZ, Beatriz José Villena 23 2º B 28017 Madrid / ES | 05 /
CARRASCO VELA, Carlos c/ Sierra Nevada 47 28691 Villanueva de la Cañada (Madrid) / ES | [2018/20] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/20] | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Cedaceros, 1 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 15898184.5 | 10.07.2015 | [2018/20] | WO2015ES70540 | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017009494 | Date: | 19.01.2017 | Language: | ES | [2017/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3321092 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 19.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B42D25/364, B42D25/328, B42D25/351, B42D25/391, B42D25/373, B41M3/14, G02B5/30, G02F1/13, G02F1/00, G07D7/121, G07D7/128 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
B42D25/364 (EP,US);
B41M3/14 (EP,US);
B41M3/148 (US);
B42D25/30 (US);
B42D25/324 (EP,US);
B42D25/328 (EP,US);
B42D25/351 (EP,US);
B42D25/373 (EP,US);
B42D25/391 (EP,US);
B42D25/405 (US);
G02B5/30 (EP,US);
G02B5/3016 (US);
G02F1/00 (EP,US);
G02F1/13 (EP,US);
G07D7/128 (EP,US);
B42D25/23 (US);
B42D25/29 (US);
G03H1/0402 (US);
G03H2001/0439 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/20] | B41M3/14, G02B5/30, G02F1/13, G02F1/00, G07D7/121, G07D7/128, B42D25/351, B42D25/30, B42D25/364, B42D25/373 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZIELUNG VON DOKUMENTENSICHERHEIT DURCH ERZEUGUNG VON MEHREREN REFLEXIVEN UND TRANSMISSIVEN LATENTBILDERN | [2018/20] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ACHIEVING DOCUMENT SECURITY BY GENERATING MULTIPLE REFLEXIVE AND TRANSMISSIVE LATENT IMAGES | [2018/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR SÉCURISER DES DOCUMENTS PAR GÉNÉRATION DE MULTIPLES IMAGES LATENTES RÉFLEXIVES ET TRANSMISSIVES | [2018/20] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2018 | Translation filed | 11.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 11.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/16] | 01.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2005071497 (EZRA DAVID [GB]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2005101101 (KURZ LEONHARD FA [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [YD]US2012300156 (QUINTANA ARREGUI XABIER [ES], et al) [YD] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [A]EP1452338 (EIDGENOESS TECH HOCHSCHULE [CH]) [A] 1, 11 * , *; | [A]WO2008110316 (TECH UNIVERSITEI EINDHOVEN [NL], et al) [A] 1, 11 * , *; | [A]WO2006005149 (A T B LATENT EXP IMP LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1, 11; | [A]WO2015028618 (BUNDESDRUCKEREI GMBH [DE]) [A] 1, 11 * , * |