EP3327924 - INTERNAL-COMBUSTION ENGINE POWER SUPPLY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAHLE Electric Drives Japan Corporation 3744 Ohka Numazu-shi Shizuoka 410-0022 / JP | [2018/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAGAWA, Masanori c/o MAHLE Electric Drives Japan Corporation 3744 Ohka Numazu-shi Shizuoka 410-0022 / JP | [2018/22] | Representative(s) | Broderick, Terence Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/22] | Broderick, Terence Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 15898861.8 | 17.07.2015 | [2018/22] | WO2015JP70494 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017013699 | Date: | 26.01.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3327924 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02P9/30, H02P1/02, H02P1/16, H02P9/08, H02P11/04, H02K21/04, H02M7/155, H02P9/10, H02P9/04, H02P9/48 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
H02P9/305 (EP,US);
H02K21/04 (EP,US);
H02K21/046 (EP,US);
H02M7/155 (EP,US);
H02M7/1557 (EP,US);
H02P1/02 (EP,US);
H02P1/16 (EP,US);
H02P11/04 (EP,US);
H02P9/04 (EP,US);
H02P9/08 (EP,US);
H02P9/10 (EP,US);
H02P9/107 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/22] | H02P9/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] | Title | German: | STROMVERSORGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | [2018/22] | English: | INTERNAL-COMBUSTION ENGINE POWER SUPPLY DEVICE | [2018/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE DE MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2018/22] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2018 | Translation filed | 02.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 02.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/50] | 04.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 19.02.2018 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.04.2018 | 31.07.2018 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   06.09.2018 | 31.07.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5714871 (ENDOU TSUNEAKI [JP]) [A] 1-12* column 4, line 65 - column 10, line 28; figures 1, 2, 5, 11-13 *; | [Y]US5808451 (ENDOU TSUNEAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * column 6, line 3 - column 9, line 21; figures 1, 2, 5 *; | [Y]US2004025839 (KASHIBATA KAZUYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0010]; figures 3-5, 7 * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0091] *; | [A]US2008122643 (KAWAGOE JUN [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0055]; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]JP2005245144 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [Y] 1-12 * , paragraphs [0003], [0040] to [0045] & US 2005/0190524 A1 & EP 1568533 A1 & CN 1660621 A *; | [Y]JPH11234992 (KOKUSAN DENKI CO) [Y] 1-12 * , paragraph [0049]; fig. 2 & US 6111390 A *; | [YA]JP2013146131 (KOKUSAN DENKI CO) [Y] 6-8, 11-12 * , paragraphs [0032] to [0038]; fig. 1 (Family: none) * [A] 1-5, 9-10; | [A]JP2003079004 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-12 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]US6414400 (SCOTT HAROLD C [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * , entire text; all drawings & WO 2001/058002 A2 * |