EP3329260 - METHOD OF TESTING THE COLOR QUALITY OF A COLORED GEMSTONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deng, Wenshuai Room 014 No. 91 Renmin East Road Kaiyun Town, Hengshan Hunan / CN | [2018/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/23] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/50] |
Former [2018/23] | Moore, Graeme Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 15899264.4 | 29.07.2015 | [2018/23] | WO2015CN85476 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017015912 | Date: | 02.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3329260 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3329260 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.02.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/87, G01J3/52, G01N21/29 | [2018/29] | CPC: |
G01N21/87 (EP,US);
G01J3/52 (EP,US);
G01N21/293 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/23] | G01N21/87 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM TESTEN DER FARBQUALITÄT EINES FARBIGEN EDELSTEINS | [2018/23] | English: | METHOD OF TESTING THE COLOR QUALITY OF A COLORED GEMSTONE | [2018/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TEST DE LA QUALITÉ DE COULEUR D'UNE PIERRE PRÉCIEUSE COLORÉE | [2018/23] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 06.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/23] | 29.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.12.2023 | CZ | 13.12.2023 | EE | 13.12.2023 | ES | 13.12.2023 | HR | 13.12.2023 | LT | 13.12.2023 | LV | 13.12.2023 | NL | 13.12.2023 | PL | 13.12.2023 | RO | 13.12.2023 | RS | 13.12.2023 | SE | 13.12.2023 | SK | 13.12.2023 | SM | 13.12.2023 | BG | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.03.2024 | GR | 14.03.2024 | IS | 13.04.2024 | PT | 15.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 13.12.2023 | |
CZ | 13.12.2023 | ||
EE | 13.12.2023 | ||
ES | 13.12.2023 | ||
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RO | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 13.12.2023 | |
ES | 13.12.2023 | ||
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 13.12.2023 | |
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 14.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4527895 (RUBIN HOWARD [US]) [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * column 3 - column 5 *; | [A]US2015124273 (KOMATSUBARA HITOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** page 1 - page 2 * | International search | [A]US4527895 (RUBIN HOWARD [US]) [A] 1-15 * Claim 1 *; | [A]US7388656 (LIU YAN [US]) [A] 1-15 * Claim 1 *; | [A]US2008204705 (LIU YAN [US]) [A] 1-15 * Claim 1 *; | [A]US8046274 (SEVDERMISH MENAHEM [IL]) [A] 1-15 * Claim 1 *; | [A]CN103196843 (UNIV CHINA GEOSCIENCES WUHAN) [A] 1-15* Claim 1 * | Examination | - YOSHINOBU NAYATANI, "Proposal of an opponent-colors system based on color-appearance and color-vision studies", COLOR RESEARCH & APPLICATION, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC, US, (20040129), vol. 29, no. 2, doi:10.1002/COL.10234, ISSN 0361-2317, pages 135 - 150, XP071624426 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/col.10234 | by applicant | US4527895 |