EP3337142 - MOBILE TERMINAL AND CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2018/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NO, Hyohoun IP Center LG Electronics 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
NA, Sungchae IP Center LG Electronics 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
AHN, Dohwan IP Center LG Electronics 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 04 /
IM, Dongseon IP Center LG Electronics 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2018/25] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2018/25] | Application number, filing date | 15901052.9 | 02.09.2015 | [2018/25] | WO2015KR09240 | Priority number, date | KR20150113410 | 11.08.2015 Original published format: KR 20150113410 | KR20150113412 | 11.08.2015 Original published format: KR 20150113412 | [2018/25] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017026570 | Date: | 16.02.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3337142 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.02.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0488, H04M1/725, G06F9/44, G06F3/041 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
G06F3/0488 (EP,US);
G06F3/04817 (US);
G06F3/0482 (US);
G06F3/0485 (US);
G06F3/0486 (US);
G06F9/44 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/25] | H04M1/725, G06F3/0488, G06F9/44, G06F3/041 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/25] | Title | German: | MOBILES ENDGERÄT UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2018/25] | English: | MOBILE TERMINAL AND CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR | [2018/25] | French: | TERMINAL MOBILE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2018/25] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2018 | Translation filed | 09.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/25] | 11.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.02.2021 | 08.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/25] | 09.02.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.02.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012274662 (KIM KUN NYUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0116] - [0131]; figures 39-59 *; | [A]WO2014117345 (MOTOROLA MOBILITY LLC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0020] - [0023]; figures 3,4 * * paragraphs [0026] - [0029]; figures 6,7 *; | [A]EP2778870 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2014139111 (MOTOROLA MOBILITY LLC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0038] - [0041]; figures 9A,9B *; | [A]EP2793119 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0154] - [0163]; figures 7A-8C * | International search | [YA]JP2010044520 (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB) [Y] 16, 18-30 * See paragraphs [0015], [0025]-[0042] and figures 1-6. * [A] 1-15, 17; | [Y]KR20120135723 (KIM YOUN SOO [KR], et al) [Y] 21-30 * See paragraphs [0049]-[0054], claim 25 and figures 4-5. *; | [A]KR20130024220 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-30* See paragraphs [0024]-[0039], claim 1 and figures 2-7. *; | [Y]KR20130043292 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 16, 18-20 * See paragraph [0149] and figure 11. *; | [A]KR20130047790 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-30 * See paragraphs [0050]-[0052] and figures 8-9. * |