EP3328148 - METHOD FOR RADIO COMMUNICATION, NETWORK DEVICE, USER EQUIPMENT, AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2018/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Chao Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2018/22] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2018/22] | Application number, filing date | 15901895.1 | 21.08.2015 | [2018/22] | WO2015CN87743 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017031621 | Date: | 02.03.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3328148 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04 | [2018/29] | CPC: |
H04L1/08 (EP);
H04W74/006 (KR);
H04W72/20 (US);
H04L1/1861 (US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/23 (EP,US);
H04W74/04 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/22] | H04W74/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FUNKKOMMUNIKATION, NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG, BENUTZERGERÄT UND SYSTEM | [2018/22] | English: | METHOD FOR RADIO COMMUNICATION, NETWORK DEVICE, USER EQUIPMENT, AND SYSTEM | [2018/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION RADIO, DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU, ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR ET SYSTÈME | [2018/22] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2018 | Translation filed | 19.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 19.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 19.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/48] | 12.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/48] | Divisional application(s) | EP22173088.0 / EP4102917 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2022 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN101299821 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [X] 1,5,9,13,17 * figures 1-5 * * page 4 - page 11 *[I] 2-4,6-8,10-12,14-16; | [XI]WO2013009088 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,9,10,13,14,17 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0157] * [I] 3,4,7,8,11,12,15,16; | [XI]US2013343307 (DESAI VIPUL [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,9,10,13,14,17 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0064] * [I] 3,4,7,8,11,12,15,16; | [XI]WO2014172306 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,9,10,13,14,17 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0151] - paragraph [0186] * [I] 3,4,7,8,11,12,15,16; | [XI]US2015043398 (FWU JONG-KAE [US], et al) [X] 1,5,9,13,17 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0117] * [I] 2-4,6-8,10-12,14-16 | International search | [X]CN101299821 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [X] 1-50 * , description, page 3, line 16 to page 4, line 21 and page 7, line 1 *; | [A]CN102158981 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-50 * , the whole document *; | [A]US2013182569 (BERTRAND PIERRE [FR], et al) [A] 1-50* , the whole document * |