EP3337095 - RESOURCE MANAGEMENT METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2018/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Xu Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
XIA, Haitao Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
YU, Fang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
LIU, Jianning Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2018/25] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2018/25] | Application number, filing date | 15902545.1 | 31.08.2015 | [2018/25] | WO2015CN88608 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017035738 | Date: | 09.03.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3337095 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24 | [2018/25] | CPC: |
H04L41/0897 (EP);
H04L47/82 (US);
H04L41/042 (EP,US);
H04L41/0806 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/25] | Title | German: | RESSOURCENVERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG | [2018/25] | English: | RESOURCE MANAGEMENT METHOD AND DEVICE | [2018/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE GESTION DE RESSOURCES | [2018/25] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2018 | Translation filed | 12.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 12.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/25] | 12.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/07] | 06.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2518941 (OPENET TELECOM LTD [IE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0236] * * claims 1-2, 10-12, 14-16 * * figures 1-24 *; | [A]US2014317261 (SHATZKAMER KEVIN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0065] * * claims 1, 6-8, 12 * * figures 1-4, 6A-B *; | [XI]US2015142940 (MCMURRY SAM ERIC [US], et al) [X] 1,5,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0041] * * claims 1-2, 5, 11-12, 15-16 * * figures 1-4 * [I] 2-4,6-14; | [XI]US2015215228 (MCMURRY SAM ERIC [US]) [X] 1,5,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0042] * * claims 1, 9 * * figures 1-4 * [I] 2-4,6-14; | [A]WO2015113278 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [E]EP3094049 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [E] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0052] ** claims 1-45 *; | [XI] - CSOMA ATTILA ET AL, "Multi-layered Service Orchestration in a Multi-domain Network Environment", 2014 THIRD EUROPEAN WORKSHOP ON SOFTWARE DEFINED NETWORKS, IEEE, (20140901), doi:10.1109/EWSDN.2014.32, pages 141 - 142, XP032703402 [X] 1,5,15 * the whole document * [I] 2-4,6-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/EWSDN.2014.32 | International search | [A]CN104170323 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-34 * , description, paragraphs [0006]-[0077], and figures 1-6 *; | [A]CN104270428 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-34 * , the whole document *; | [A]US2015234725 (CILLIS CANIO [DE], et al) [A] 1-34 * , the whole document *; | [A] - European Telecommunications Standards Institute (etsi), "Network Functions Virtualisation (NFV); Management and Orchestration", ETSI GS NFV-MAN 001 V1.1.1 (2014-12), (20141231), pages 1 - 184, URL: http://www.etsi.org/deliver/etsi_gs/NFV-MAN/001_099/001/01.01.01_60/gs_NFV-MAN001v010101p.pdf, XP055366912 [A] 1-34 * , chapter 5 * |