EP3314391 - PRINTER POWER MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring TX 77389 / US | [2019/20] |
Former [2018/18] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, Texas 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOEPL, Devin Nichlos 1115 SE 164th Avenue Columbia Center Suite 210 Vancouver, Washington 98683 / US | [2018/18] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/18] | Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 15905590.4 | 30.09.2015 | [2018/18] | WO2015US53217 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017058203 | Date: | 06.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3314391 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12 | [2018/18] | CPC: |
H04N1/00899 (EP,US);
G06F1/32 (KR,US);
G06F1/3284 (EP,US);
G06F11/3013 (EP,KR,US);
G06F11/3062 (EP,KR,US);
H04N1/00068 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/18] | Title | German: | DRUCKERLEISTUNGSVERWALTUNG | [2018/18] | English: | PRINTER POWER MANAGEMENT | [2018/18] | French: | GESTION DE PUISSANCE D'IMPRIMANTE | [2018/18] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/18] | 25.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/03] | 30.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2023 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006182458 (HALL JEFFREY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0040] - [0052]; figure 3; claims 1-5 *; | [Y]US2011304876 (COFFEY DAVID F [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2014229754 (OVERBY MARK A [US], et al) [Y] 5 * paragraphs [0026] - [0029]; figure 3; claim 1 *; | [Y]US9075589 (WADA KATSUHIRO [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * columns 10-12; figure 8; claim 1 * * columns 21-23 *; | [A] - Anonymous, "Finite-state machine - Wikipedia", (20150928), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Finite-state_machine&oldid=683228594, (20190204), XP055551531 [A] 1-15 * page 1 * | International search | [Y]US2011304876 (COFFEY DAVID F [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0001]-[0005], [0011], [0019], [0022]-[0029]; and figure 5. *; | [Y]US7240334 (FLUKE JOHN CHRISTIAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * See column 5, lines 42-47; column 7, lines 59-62; and figures 2-4. *; | [A]EP2608514 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0001], [0024]; and figure 8B. *; | [A]US2008086655 (SHIPTON GARY [AU], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0045], [0098]; and figure 1. *; | [A]US2005146546 (GODIL AMIN M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0007], [0022]; and figure 4. * | by applicant | US2014229754 | US2006182458 |