EP3248226 - MICRO-LED TRANSFERRING METHOD AND MANUFACTURING METHOD OF MICRO-LED DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/48] | TRANSFERRING METHOD, MANUFACTURING METHOD, DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS OF MICRO-LED | ||
[2019/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goertek Inc. No. 268 Dongfang Road Hi-Tech Industry District Weifang, Shandong 261031 / CN | [2017/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZOU, Quanbo 268 Dongfang Road Hi-Tech Industry District Weifang Shandong 261031 / CN | 02 /
LU, Manen 268 Dongfang Road Hi-Tech Industry District Weifang Shandong 261031 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Zhe 268 Dongfang Road Hi-Tech Industry District Weifang Shandong 261031 / CN | [2017/48] | Representative(s) | Hübner, Gerd, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstraße 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [2020/09] |
Former [2017/48] | Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstraße 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 15907618.1 | 04.11.2015 | [2017/48] | WO2015CN93787 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017075776 | Date: | 11.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3248226 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3248226 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00, // H01L33/20 | [2018/06] | CPC: |
H01L33/0095 (EP,US);
H01L33/0093 (CN,US);
H01L21/68 (US);
H01L21/786 (US);
H01L25/0753 (CN,US);
H01L27/15 (US);
H01L33/20 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81815 (EP);
H01L2224/83851 (EP);
H01L2224/95 (EP);
H01L2224/95001 (EP);
H01L2224/95133 (EP);
H01L2224/95136 (EP);
H01L2224/95144 (EP);
H01L2224/95145 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/81815, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/83851, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/95133, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/95144, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/95145, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/95, H01L2224/81 (EP); |
Former IPC [2017/48] | H01L33/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKRO-LED-ÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINER MICRO-LED-VORRICHTUNG | [2019/42] | English: | MICRO-LED TRANSFERRING METHOD AND MANUFACTURING METHOD OF MICRO-LED DEVICE | [2019/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFERT DE MICRO-DELS ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN DISPOSITIF À MICRO-DELS | [2019/42] |
Former [2017/48] | ÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG EINER MIKRO-LED | ||
Former [2017/48] | TRANSFERRING METHOD, MANUFACTURING METHOD, DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS OF MICRO-LED | ||
Former [2017/48] | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFERT, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, DISPOSITIF ET APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE DE MICRO-DEL | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/48] | 22.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.11.2015 | AL | 26.02.2020 | AT | 26.02.2020 | CY | 26.02.2020 | CZ | 26.02.2020 | DK | 26.02.2020 | EE | 26.02.2020 | ES | 26.02.2020 | FI | 26.02.2020 | HR | 26.02.2020 | IT | 26.02.2020 | LT | 26.02.2020 | LV | 26.02.2020 | MC | 26.02.2020 | MK | 26.02.2020 | MT | 26.02.2020 | NL | 26.02.2020 | PL | 26.02.2020 | RO | 26.02.2020 | RS | 26.02.2020 | SE | 26.02.2020 | SI | 26.02.2020 | SK | 26.02.2020 | SM | 26.02.2020 | TR | 26.02.2020 | BG | 26.05.2020 | NO | 26.05.2020 | GR | 27.05.2020 | IS | 26.06.2020 | PT | 19.07.2020 | IE | 04.11.2020 | LU | 04.11.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 04.11.2015 | |
AT | 26.02.2020 | ||
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
IE | 04.11.2020 | ||
LU | 04.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
IE | 04.11.2020 | ||
LU | 04.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
LU | 04.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
NO | 26.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2011133216 (SUGAWARA YASUHARU [JP]) [Y] 1-10* paragraphs [0001] - [0058] - [ 0074] - [0077]; figures 1-3, 8 *; | [XYI]US2011151602 (SPEIER INGO [CA]) [X] 11 * paragraphs [0001] - [0013] - [ 0060] - [0074] - [ 0096] , [ 0097] - [0101]; figures 2, 3, 8, 10 * [Y] 1-10 [I] 12 | International search | [A]CN1364246 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A]CN102509731 (XIAMEN SANAN OPTOELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]CN102800778 (DONGGUAN FORTUNE ELECTRONIC MATERIAL CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]CN103647012 (INST SEMICONDUCTORS CAS) [X] 1-12 * description paragraphs [0022]-[0026] figure 2 *; | [A]US2014355168 (BIBL ANDREAS [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | Examination | US2011151377 | WO2015107290 |