EP3211535 - WRITE REQUEST PROCESSING METHOD, PROCESSOR AND COMPUTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.04.2019 [2019/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2017/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAN, Chunbao Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Yu Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
ZHENG, Wei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2017/35] | Representative(s) | Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/35] | Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al Huawei Technologies Riesstrasse 8 80992 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 15908487.0 | 17.12.2015 | [2017/35] | WO2015CN97742 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017101080 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3211535 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/1045, G06F13/40, G06F13/42, G06F3/06, G06F12/0804, G06F11/20, G06F12/0868, G06F12/0815 | [2017/47] | CPC: |
G06F12/0804 (EP,US);
G06F12/1045 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/061 (US);
G06F11/2076 (EP,US);
G06F12/0868 (EP,US);
G06F13/4022 (EP,US);
G06F13/4282 (EP,US);
G06F3/0619 (US);
G06F3/065 (US);
G06F3/067 (US);
G06F12/0815 (EP,US);
G06F2212/314 (EP,US);
G06F2213/0026 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/35] | G06F12/1045 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON SCHREIBANFRAGEN, PROZESSOR UND COMPUTER | [2017/35] | English: | WRITE REQUEST PROCESSING METHOD, PROCESSOR AND COMPUTER | [2017/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE DEMANDE D'ÉCRITURE, PROCESSEUR ET ORDINATEUR | [2017/35] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2017 | Translation filed | 25.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/35] | 25.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/16] | 08.03.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.06.2019 | 12.06.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006212644 (ACTON JOHN D [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * figures 3-4 * * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0014] - [0025] - [0 50] - [0069] *; | [I]US2011238909 (KUMAR PANKAJ [US], et al) [I] 1-24 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0007] - [0036] * * claims 1-7 *; | [A]WO2015062300 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD [CN]) [A] 4 * figure 2c *; | US2016239387 [ ] (FU HONGCHENG [CN], et al) [ ] * figure 2c ** paragraphs [0216] - [0241] * | International search | [X]CN102081561 (INTEL CORP) [X] 1,6-8, 12-13, 18-20, 24-25, 30-32, 36 * , description, paragraphs [0017]-[0026], claim 1, and figures 2A and 3 *; | [A]US2011238909 (KUMAR PANKAJ [US], et al) [A] 1-36 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN104572508 (SHANDONG CHAOYUE NUMERICAL CONTROL ELECTRONIC CO LTD) [A] 1-36 * , the whole document *; | [A]US2015160984 (INAGAKI JUNICHI [JP]) [A] 1-36* , the whole document * |