EP3379159 - AIR CONDITIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2018/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAGUCHI, Tomoyuki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008310 / JP | 02 /
TAKATA, Shigeo c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008310 / JP | 03 /
SATO, Mario c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008310 / JP | [2021/36] |
Former [2018/39] | 01 /
KAWAGUCHI, Tomoyuki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKATA, Shigeo c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
03 /
SATO, Mario c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2018/39] | Application number, filing date | 15908799.8 | 20.11.2015 | [2018/39] | WO2015JP82664 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017085859 | Date: | 26.05.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3379159 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3379159 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F25B13/00, F25B25/00, F25B49/02 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
F24F11/89 (EP);
F25B49/02 (EP);
F25B2313/003 (EP);
F25B2313/006 (EP);
F25B2313/0231 (EP);
F25B2313/0233 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2018/39] | F24F11/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLIMAANLAGE | [2018/39] | English: | AIR CONDITIONER | [2018/39] | French: | CLIMATISEUR | [2018/39] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2018 | Translation filed | 11.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 11.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.11.2015 | AL | 08.09.2021 | AT | 08.09.2021 | CY | 08.09.2021 | CZ | 08.09.2021 | DK | 08.09.2021 | EE | 08.09.2021 | ES | 08.09.2021 | FI | 08.09.2021 | HR | 08.09.2021 | IT | 08.09.2021 | LT | 08.09.2021 | LV | 08.09.2021 | MC | 08.09.2021 | MK | 08.09.2021 | MT | 08.09.2021 | NL | 08.09.2021 | PL | 08.09.2021 | RO | 08.09.2021 | RS | 08.09.2021 | SE | 08.09.2021 | SI | 08.09.2021 | SK | 08.09.2021 | SM | 08.09.2021 | TR | 08.09.2021 | IE | 20.11.2021 | LU | 20.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | CH | 30.11.2021 | FR | 30.11.2021 | LI | 30.11.2021 | BG | 08.12.2021 | NO | 08.12.2021 | GR | 09.12.2021 | IS | 08.01.2022 | PT | 10.01.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 20.11.2015 | |
AL | 08.09.2021 | ||
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CY | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
MK | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
TR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IE | 20.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 20.11.2015 | |
AL | 08.09.2021 | ||
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CY | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
MK | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
IE | 20.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 20.11.2015 | |
AL | 08.09.2021 | ||
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CY | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
IE | 20.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 20.11.2015 | |
AL | 08.09.2021 | ||
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
IE | 20.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
IE | 20.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
IE | 20.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
IE | 20.11.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
LU | 20.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | ES | 08.09.2021 | |
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 08.09.2021 | |
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 08.09.2021 | |
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 08.09.2021 | |
NO | 08.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05196267 (HITACHI AIR CONDITIONING & REF) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US6668572 (SEO KOOK-JEONG [KR], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1-3b *; | [A]EP2314939 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,6,7 * figures 3-8 *; | [A]EP2476966 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7* figures 7,8 *; | [X]WO2012172613 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,6,7 * abstract *; | [A]EP2767773 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * figure 1 * | International search | [XA]JPH05196267 (HITACHI AIR CONDITIONING & REF) [X] 1-2, 7 * , paragraphs [0013] to [0015], [0020], [0023]; fig. 1, 4 to 5 (Family: none) *[A] 3-6; | [XA]WO2012172613 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-2,7 * , paragraphs [0019] to [0065], [0109] to [0133]; fig. 1 to 2, 7 to 8 & US 2014/0137589 A1 paragraphs [0040] to [0121], [0192] to [0228]; fig. 1 to 2, 7 to 8 & EP 2722604 A1 & CN 103562648 A * [A] 3-6 | by applicant | US2010049998 | US2011030429 |