EP3347569 - MATERIAL EVALUATION USING NUCLEAR LOGGING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 3000 N. Sam Houston Parkway E. Houston, TX 77032-3219 / US | [2018/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Yike 14500 Cutten Road Apt. 12309 Houston, Texas 77069 / US | 02 /
GUO, Weijun 1211 Pinerock Lane Houston, Texas 77024 / US | [2018/29] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/29] | Application number, filing date | 15908961.4 | 19.11.2015 | [2018/29] | WO2015US61572 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017086973 | Date: | 26.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3347569 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.05.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | E21B47/00, G01V5/04, G01V5/12, E21B47/005 | [2018/29] | CPC: |
G01V5/101 (EP,US);
E21B47/005 (EP,US);
G01V5/125 (US);
E21B33/14 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/29] | Title | German: | MATERIALBEWERTUNG MIT EINEM NUKLEAREN MESSWERKZEUG | [2018/29] | English: | MATERIAL EVALUATION USING NUCLEAR LOGGING TOOL | [2018/29] | French: | ÉVALUATION DE MATÉRIAU À L'AIDE D'UN OUTIL DE DIAGRAPHIE NUCLÉAIRE | [2018/29] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/29] | 13.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0443936 (SCHLUMBERGER LTD [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,12,13 * figures 1, 2, 3, 5 * * abstract * * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 47 * * column 3, lines 34-47 * * column 5, line 40 - column 6, line 7 * * column 6, lines 28-32 * * column 6, line 58 - column 8, line 51 * * column 1, lines 2-17 * [Y] 10,11; | [XY]WO2011127156 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7,8,12 * abstract * * figures 2, 4 * * paragraphs [0016] - [0017] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraphs [0038] - [0043] * [Y] 9,14,15; | [Y]US2014374582 (GUO PINGJUN [US], et al) [Y] 9-11,14,15 * abstract * * figures 2, 5A, 7A, 8, 9 * * paragraphs [0032] - [0033] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraphs [0038] - [0040] ** paragraph [0044] *; | [E]WO2017030578 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES INC [US]) [E] 1-11,13 * abstract * * figures 1, 2, 4-7 * * paragraphs [0015] - [0016] * * paragraphs [0022] - [0027] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraphs [0033] - [0042] * * paragraphs [0056] - [0057] * * paragraph [0061] * | International search | [A]US4698500 (SCALA CARL [US]) [A] 1-20 * See claim 1 and figure 1. *; | [XY]EP0443936 (SCHLUMBERGER LTD [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 5-12, 16-18 * See column 5, lines 24-26, column 7, lines 1-20, claims 1, 7-10, 13-14, 16, and figures 2-3. * [Y] 4, 13-15, 19-20; | [A]US2014217273 (GRAU JAMES A [US]) [A] 1-20 * See abstract, claim 1, and figures 1A-1B. *; | [A]US2015108339 (GUO WEIJUN [US], et al) [A] 1-20* See claims 1, 11 and figures 1-3. *; | [Y]WO2015112118 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES INC [US]) [Y] 4, 13-15, 19-20 * See paragraphs [0017], [0033], claim 1, and figures 1-2A, 4B. * | by applicant | US4071757 | EP0443936 | WO2011127156 | US2014374582 | WO2017030578 |