EP3385087 - MAGNETIC WHEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2021 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applus Servicios Tecnologicos, S.L. Campus UAB Ronda de la Font del Carme s/n 08193 BellaTerra, Barcelona / ES | [2018/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REBOREDO LOSADA, Oscar Ctra. N-VI Km. 582 15168 Sada (A Coruña) / ES | [2018/41] | Representative(s) | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Edificio Aqua - Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2018/41] | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Cedaceros, 1 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 15909661.9 | 30.11.2015 | [2018/41] | WO2015ES70867 | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017093580 | Date: | 08.06.2017 | Language: | ES | [2017/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3385087 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 08.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60B19/00, B61C15/04, H01F7/02 | [2018/41] | CPC: |
B60B19/006 (EP,US);
B60B3/085 (US);
B61C15/04 (EP,US);
B60B2900/351 (EP,US);
B60B2900/551 (EP,US);
H01F7/02 (EP,US);
Y02T10/86 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/41] | Title | German: | MAGNETISCHES RAD | [2018/41] | English: | MAGNETIC WHEEL | [2018/41] | French: | ROUE MAGNÉTIQUE | [2018/41] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2018 | Translation filed | 25.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/41] | 25.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/10] | 03.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US2006162610 (REBOREDO LOSADA OSCAR [ES], et al) [YD] 1-5* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP2327612 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0029]; figures 1,2 * | International search | [X]JPH07324479 (HONSHU SHIKOKU RENKAKUKYO, et al) [X] 1, 4 * , abstract; description; figures 1 - 4. *; | [X]WO9724251 (HONSHU SHIKOKU BRIDGE AUTHORIT [JP], et al) [X] 1, 4 * , abstract; description; figures 1 - 4. *; | [X]JP2007051416 (GIJUTSU KAIHATSU KENKYUSHO KK) [X] 1, 4 * , abstract; description; figures 8 - 11. *; | [A]EP0526900 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1, 2, 4 * , column 1, lines 3 - 16; column 1, line 41 - column 3, line 11; column 4, lines 1 - 24; column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 28; figures 1, 3, 5 and 6. *; | [A]US2014230711 (LOVELACE REGINALD BENJAMIN [US], et al) [A] 1, 3 * , paragraph [0002]; paragraphs[0009 - 0011]; paragraph [0018]; paragraphs [0021-0023]; paragraph [0064]; paragraphs[0069 - 0070]; paragraph [0074]; figures 2, 3, 4 - 6. *; | [A]EP2327612 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]) [A] 1 * , paragraphs [0005 - 0006]; paragraph [0022]; paragraphs [0026-0029]; figures 1 - 4. *; | [A] - FABIEN TACHE et al., "Adapted magnetic wheel unit for compact robots inspecting complex shaped pipe structures. Advanced Intelliget Mechatronics", IEEE /ASME International Confere nce on, 20070901 IEEE , Pi 01/09/2007, (20070901), ISBN 978-1-4244-1263-1, pages 1 - 6, XP031197492 [A] 1-3 |