EP3385632 - INDOOR UNIT OF AIR CONDITIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2018/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIKAWA, Masato c/o Mitsubishi Electric Engineering Company Limited 1-13-5 Kudankita Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Akimoto c/o Mitsubishi Electric Engineering Company Limited 1-13-5 Kudankita Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | 03 /
KINAMI, Masahide c/o Mitsubishi Electric Engineering Company Limited 1-13-5 Kudankita Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | 04 /
YASUTOMI, Kiyoshi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Engineering Company Limited 1-13-5 Kudankita Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | [2018/41] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2018/41] | Application number, filing date | 15909804.5 | 03.12.2015 | [2018/41] | WO2015JP84077 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017094174 | Date: | 08.06.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3385632 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3385632 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F24F1/0011, F24F13/22, F24F13/14 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
F24F1/0011 (EP);
F24F13/14 (EP,US);
F24F13/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/41] | F24F13/14, F24F13/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INNENRAUMEINHEIT EINER KLIMAANLAGE | [2018/41] | English: | INDOOR UNIT OF AIR CONDITIONER | [2018/41] | French: | UNITÉ D'INTÉRIEUR DE CLIMATISEUR | [2018/41] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2018 | Translation filed | 28.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2018 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/41] | 28.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.02.2024 | BG | 07.02.2024 | ES | 07.02.2024 | FI | 07.02.2024 | HR | 07.02.2024 | LT | 07.02.2024 | LV | 07.02.2024 | NL | 07.02.2024 | PL | 07.02.2024 | SE | 07.02.2024 | NO | 07.05.2024 | RS | 07.05.2024 | GR | 08.05.2024 | IS | 07.06.2024 | PT | 07.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
LV | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
PL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
PT | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 07.02.2024 | |
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 07.02.2024 | |
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 07.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6453844U (MUNEKATA CO., LTD.) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH06137660 (UNITIKA LTD) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0009] - [0025]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]JP2878391B (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) [A] 1* pages 2-3; figure 4 *; | [A]JP2005121306 (SHARP KK) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0025] - [0028]; figures 1-7 * | International search | [YA]JPS6453844U (Munekata Co., Ltd.) [Y] 1-3 * , specification, page 5, lines 6 to 13; fig. 4 (Family: none) * [A] 4; | [A]JPH09250804 (MATSUSHITA REFRIGERATION, et al) [A] 1-4* , claims (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH10170013 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [A] 1-4 * , claims (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2005121306 (SHARP KK) [Y] 1-3 * , claims; paragraphs [0025] to [0028]; fig. 1 to 7 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2009014289 (PANASONIC CORP) [A] 1-4 * , claims (Family: none) * | Examination | JP2002156130 |