EP3387162 - SYSTEM CONFIGURED FOR SPUTTER DEPOSITION ON A SUBSTRATE, SHIELDING DEVICE FOR A SPUTTER DEPOSITION CHAMBER, AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING AN ELECTRICAL SHIELDING IN A SPUTTER DEPOSITION CHAMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2018/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZILBAUER, Thomas Werner Rosenstrasse 13 82131 Gauting / DE | 02 /
HENKEL, Uwe Barbarossastrasse 2 63128 Dietzenbach/Steinberg / DE | 03 /
THIEL, Johannes Steinweg 19D 63533 Mainhausen / DE | 04 /
EL ZAAR, Kamal Wachenbuchenerstrasse 53 63454 Mittelbuchen/Hanau / DE | 05 /
KELLER, Stefan Gabelsbergerstrasse 26 63814 Mainaschaff / DE | [2018/42] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2018/42] | Application number, filing date | 15910151.8 | 09.12.2015 | [2018/42] | WO2015IB02317 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017098292 | Date: | 15.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3387162 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/34, C23C14/54, H01J37/34, H01J37/32 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
C23C14/3471 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/3441 (US);
C23C14/564 (KR);
H01J37/32477 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/32605 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/32651 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/42] | C23C14/34, C23C14/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] | Title | German: | SYSTEM MIT KONFIGURATION ZUR SPUTTERABSCHEIDUNG AUF EINEM SUBSTRAT, ABSCHIRMVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE SPUTTERABSCHEIDUNGSKAMMER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ELEKTRISCHEN ABSCHIRMUNG IN EINER SPUTTERABSCHEIDUNGSKAMMER | [2018/42] | English: | SYSTEM CONFIGURED FOR SPUTTER DEPOSITION ON A SUBSTRATE, SHIELDING DEVICE FOR A SPUTTER DEPOSITION CHAMBER, AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING AN ELECTRICAL SHIELDING IN A SPUTTER DEPOSITION CHAMBER | [2018/42] | French: | SYSTÈME CONFIGURÉ POUR LE DÉPÔT PAR PULVÉRISATION SUR UN SUBSTRAT, DISPOSITIF DE BLINDAGE POUR UNE CHAMBRE DE DÉPÔT PAR PULVÉRISATION ET PROCÉDÉ POUR RÉALISER UN BLINDAGE ÉLECTRIQUE DANS UNE CHAMBRE DE DÉPÔT PAR PULVÉRISATION | [2018/42] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2018 | Search fee paid | 18.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/42] | 18.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 03.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0320016 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,8 * abstract * * column 1, lines 2-6 ** column 3, line 49 - column 5, line 37 *; | [XAI]US2005039679 (KLESHOCK MARK [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8,10,13-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0029] - [0038] - [0070] , [0071] * [A] 9,11,12 [I] 5,6; | [A]US2012024449 (RICCI ANTHONY [US], et al) [A] 1,8,14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0011] - [0026] *; | [XA]US2013319855 (LI JINLEI [CN]) [X] 8-11,13,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0047] - [0051] - [0054] - [0060] - [0069] * [A] 1-7 | International search | [A]US2011126763 (PEI SHAO-KAI [TW]) [A] 1-4, 8-10, 15 * See abstract, paragraphs [0010]-[0021], and figures 1-3. *; | [A]US2011139246 (DRAYTON JENNIFER A [US]) [A] 1-4, 8-10, 15 * See abstract, paragraphs [0030]-[0043], and figures 1-4. *; | [A]US2013186338 (TSAI MING-CHIN [TW], et al) [A] 1-4, 8-10, 15 * See abstract, paragraphs [0014]-[0016], and figures 1A-1C. *; | [A]US2013316079 (ELLRICH JENS [DE], et al) [A] 1-4, 8-10, 15* See abstract, paragraphs [0022]-[0025], and figures la, 1b. *; | [X]US2013319855 (LI JINLEI [CN]) [X] 1-4, 8-10, 15 * See abstract, paragraphs [0047]-[0050], [0054]-[0059], and figures 2, 5. * |