EP3388909 - DISPLAY METHOD, DISPLAY PROGRAM, AND DISPLAY CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2018/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOMAMOTO, Satoshi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
NISHIMURA, Takehiko c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2018/42] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/42] | Application number, filing date | 15910235.9 | 09.12.2015 | [2018/42] | WO2015JP84583 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017098619 | Date: | 15.06.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3388909 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/418, G06Q50/04, G05B19/409 | [2019/04] | CPC: |
G05B19/409 (EP,US);
G06T11/206 (US);
G05B19/418 (EP,US);
G05B19/41865 (EP,US);
G06F3/0482 (US);
G06F3/147 (US);
G06Q50/04 (EP,US);
G05B2219/31472 (EP,US);
G05B2219/31478 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/42] | G05B19/418, G06Q50/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVERFAHREN, ANZEIGEPROGRAMM UND ANZEIGESTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/42] | English: | DISPLAY METHOD, DISPLAY PROGRAM, AND DISPLAY CONTROL DEVICE | [2018/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AFFICHAGE, PROGRAMME D'AFFICHAGE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'AFFICHAGE | [2018/42] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2018 | Translation filed | 06.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 06.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/42] | 06.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2353616 (FISHER ROSEMOUNT SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-4 * page 26, line 12 - page 29, line 9; figures 10-16 *; | [A]EP2849069 (AXIS AB [SE]) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0034] - [0043]; figure 2a * | International search | [XA]JP2012022602 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 3-4, 10, 14 * , paragraphs [0011] to [0019]; fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) * [A] 1-2, 5-9, 11-13, 15; | [A]JP2009025851 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-15 * , paragraphs [0079] to [0080]; fig. 21 & US 2009/0024239 A1 paragraphs [0103] to [0104]; fig. 21 & CN 101350083 A & TW 200905589 A *; | [A]JP2015075795 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-2, 6-9, 11-13, 15 * , paragraphs [0045], [0072] to [0075], [0088] to [0090]; fig. 13, 22, 25 & US 2015/0097840 A1 paragraphs [0077], [0112] to [0116], [0130] to [0133]; fig. 13, 22, 25 & CN 104517176 A & TW 201514646 A *; | [A]JP2006302096 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) [A] 1-2, 6-9, 11-13, 15 * , paragraphs [0090], [0091]; fig. 17 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2009187266 (OLYMPUS CORP) [A] 1-2, 6-9, 11-13, 15 * , paragraphs [0062] to [0065]; fig. 9 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2010003228 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-2, 6-9, 11-13, 15 * , paragraphs [0047] to [0056]; fig. 6, 7 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2010040007 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-2, 6-9, 11-13, 15 * , paragraphs [0048] to [0063]; fig. 6A to 6N (Family: none) * |