EP3386701 - WIDE SPEED RANGE CONCRETE MONITORING CALIBRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verifi LLC 62 Whittemore Avenue Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | [2018/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TREGGER, Nathan, A. 267 Davis Street Northborough MA 01532 / US | 02 /
ROBERTS, Mark, F. 31 Bridges Lane North Andover MA 01845 / US | 03 /
HAZRATI, Kati 150 Barnes Hill Rd Concord, MA 01742 / US | 04 /
GOLDSTEIN, Greg, A. 1914 N Daniel St Arlington, VA 22201 / US | [2018/42] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/12] |
Former [2018/42] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15910337.3 | 07.12.2015 | [2018/42] | WO2015US64257 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017099711 | Date: | 15.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3386701 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3386701 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B28C7/02, B28C5/42 | [2019/31] | CPC: |
B28C7/026 (EP,KR,US);
B28C5/422 (EP,KR,US);
B28C5/4268 (KR);
B01F2101/28 (US);
G01N2011/0053 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/383 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2018/42] | B28C7/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KALIBRIERUNG DER BETONÜBERWACHUNG MIT BREITEM GESCHWINDIGKEITSBEREICH | [2018/42] | English: | WIDE SPEED RANGE CONCRETE MONITORING CALIBRATION | [2018/42] | French: | ÉTALONNAGE DE CONTRÔLE DE BÉTON À LARGE PLAGE DE VITESSE | [2018/42] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 07.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/42] | 07.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23155311.6 / EP4198509 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.03.2023 | CZ | 22.03.2023 | DK | 22.03.2023 | EE | 22.03.2023 | FI | 22.03.2023 | HR | 22.03.2023 | LT | 22.03.2023 | LV | 22.03.2023 | MC | 22.03.2023 | PL | 22.03.2023 | RO | 22.03.2023 | RS | 22.03.2023 | SI | 22.03.2023 | SK | 22.03.2023 | SM | 22.03.2023 | GR | 23.06.2023 | IS | 22.07.2023 | PT | 24.07.2023 | LU | 07.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/10] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 22.03.2023 | |
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 22.03.2023 | |
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 22.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2011029134 (HAZRATI KATI [US], et al) [X] 19 * paragraph [0052] *[A] 1-18; | [XA]US2012004790 (COOLEY ROY [US], et al) [X] 19 * paragraphs [0069] - [0072] - [0085] - [0087] * [A] 1-18; | [XA]CN102944670 (XCMG CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO) [X] 19 * abstract * [A] 1-18 | International search | [Y]US2011029134 (HAZRATI KATI [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * , entire document, especially Abstract; Para [0021]-[0022], [0024], [0055]-[0058], [0065] *; | [A]US2012004790 (COOLEY ROY [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * , entire document *; | [A]US2012016523 (KOEHLER ERIC [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * , entire document *; | [A]US2012020180 (KOEHLER ERIC [US], et al) [A] 1-19* , entire document *; | [Y]WO2015160610 (VERIFI LLC [US]) [Y] 1-19 * , entire document, especially Abstract; page 8, In 15-25; page 14, In 20 to page 15, In 20; page 17, In 25 to page 18, In 15 * | by applicant | US8020431 | US2012004790 | US8118473 | US2012204625 | US8311678 | CN102944670 | US8491717 | US8727604 | US8746954 | US8764272 | US8764273 | US2015051737 | US8989905 | WO2015073825 |