EP3120996 - SYSTEM TO BE USED ON MECHANICAL PRESSES FOR ENABLING A RE-USE OF THE KINETIC ENERGY OF THE MOVING MASSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Farina Presse Srl Via Provinciale, 31 23867 Suello (LC) / IT | [2017/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Formenti, Sergio Via Cascina a Valle, 25 I - 22031 Albavilla (LC) / IT | [2017/04] | Application number, filing date | 16000353.9 | 12.02.2016 | [2017/04] | Priority number, date | CH20150000225 | 20.02.2015 Original published format: CH 2252015 | [2017/04] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3120996 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B30B15/14, B30B1/26, F03G3/08, F03G7/08 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
B30B1/266 (EP);
F03G3/08 (EP,US);
B30B15/148 (EP);
F03G7/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] |
Former [2017/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUF MECHANISCHEN PRESSEN ANWENDBARES SYSTEM FÜR DIE NUTBARMACHUNG DER KINETISCHEN ENERGIE DER MASSEN IN BEWEGUNG | [2017/04] | English: | SYSTEM TO BE USED ON MECHANICAL PRESSES FOR ENABLING A RE-USE OF THE KINETIC ENERGY OF THE MOVING MASSES | [2017/04] | French: | SYSTÈME UTILISABLE SUR DES PRESSES MÉCANIQUES, RENDANT POSSIBLE LA RÉUTILISATION DE L'ÉNERGIE CINÉTIQUE DES MASSES EN MOUVEMENT | [2017/04] | Examination procedure | 12.02.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/04] | 22.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/18] | 06.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/48] | 21.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/48] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 25.05.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 25.05.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.10.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 25.05.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 25.05.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.10.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1880837 (SCHULER PRESSEN GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-6* paragraph [0014]; figure -; claim - *; | [X]EP1930149 (BURKHARDT GMBH MASCHINENFABRIK [DE]) [X] 1-3 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]WO2010063329 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH], et al) [X] 1,6 * page 18, line 1 - line 6; figure -; claim - *; | [X]US2013074558 (TADO MASASHI [JP]) [X] 1,4,5 * paragraph [0058]; figure -; claim - * * paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0071] * | by applicant | DE4421527 |