EP3173989 - SYSTEM FOR CALCULATING LIFE PERCENTAGE OF ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flytech Technology Co., Ltd. 1F., No.168, Xing'ai Road Neihu District Taipei City 114 / TW | [2017/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAM, Tai-Seng 1F., No. 168, Xing'ai Rd., Neihu Dist. 114 Taipei City / TW | 02 /
LIN, Chiung-Chi 1F., No. 168, Xing'ai Rd., Neihu Dist. 114 Taipei City / TW | [2017/22] | Representative(s) | Zeitler Volpert Kandlbinder Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Werner-Eckert-Str. 4 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/22] | Zeitler Volpert Kandlbinder Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Herrnstrasse 44 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16001226.6 | 31.05.2016 | [2017/22] | Priority number, date | TW20150139734 | 27.11.2015 Original published format: TW 104139734 | TW20150144279 | 29.12.2015 Original published format: TW 104144279 | TW20150144716 | 31.12.2015 Original published format: TW 104144716 | [2017/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3173989 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/04, G06Q10/00 | [2017/22] | CPC: |
G06Q10/04 (EP,US);
G07C3/00 (US);
G06Q10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/01] |
Former [2017/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR BERECHNUNG DES LEBENSPROZENTSATZES EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2017/22] | English: | SYSTEM FOR CALCULATING LIFE PERCENTAGE OF ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2017/22] | French: | SYSTÈME POUR CALCULER LE POURCENTAGE DE LA DURÉE DE VIE D'UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2017/22] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/01] | 05.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/03] | 11.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005224577 (ROZENBLAT GARY D [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraphs [0008] - [0011]; claims 1-28 *; | [I]US2008177613 (CHAN HOI YEUNG [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraphs [0019] , [0024] , [0025] , [0028] , [0029] , [0031] *; | [I]US2015281015 (GRIFFITH DOUGLAS J [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraphs [0037] , [0042] , [0049] - [0053]; figure 1 *; | [I] - Anonymous, "3.2.2.4 BIOS Hardware Diagnostics and Monitoring", (20150905), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20150905012311/http://www.chabotcollege.edu/faculty/netacad/prot/ITE/course/module3/3.2.2.4/3.2.2.4.html, (20160722), XP055290567 [I] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - Anonymous, "S.M.A.R.T. - Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia", (20151118), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=S.M.A.R.T.&oldid=691293588, (20160722), XP055290582 [A] 12 * Section ATA SMART attributes * | [I] - Anonymous, "7 Tools to Monitor Your System Hardware - Raymond.CC", (20140222), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20140222202534/http://www.raymond.cc/blog/monitor-hardware-health-temperatures-voltages-and-fan-speed/, (20160722), XP055290599 [I] 1-14 * the whole document * | [I] - Anonymous, "View the time/date ranges that your computer was turned on", (20151120), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20151120022309/http://nirsoft.net/utils/computer_turned_on_times.html, (20160722), XP055290610 [I] 1-14 * figure 1 * |