EP3258003 - LAUNDRY TREATMENT DEVICE WITH ILLUMINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2018 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states V-Zug AG Industriestrasse 66 6301 Zug / CH | [2017/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keller, Stephan Obere Rebhalde 28 6340 Baar / CH | 02 /
Pfenniger, Peter Vonmattstrasse 42 6003 Luzern / CH | [2017/51] | Representative(s) | Sutter, Kurt E. Blum & Co. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [2017/51] | Application number, filing date | 16001337.1 | 14.06.2016 | [2017/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3258003 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | D06F58/04, D06F58/28, D06F39/00, D06F37/26, // D06F58/20, D06F25/00, D06F33/02, D06F37/02 | [2017/51] | CPC: |
D06F58/04 (EP,US);
D06F37/267 (EP);
D06F2103/00 (EP,US);
D06F2103/24 (EP,US);
D06F2103/38 (EP,US);
D06F2103/68 (EP,US);
D06F2105/58 (EP,US);
D06F25/00 (EP,US);
D06F34/28 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSCHEBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT BELEUCHTUNG | [2017/51] | English: | LAUNDRY TREATMENT DEVICE WITH ILLUMINATION | [2017/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE LINGE AVEC ECLAIRAGE | [2017/51] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/51] | 31.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/51] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]DE4026547 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1,7 * column 1, line 37 - column 2, line 61 * * figure 1 * [A] 9,10,12-17 [I] 2-6,8,11; | [XAI]DE4128904 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1,2,7 * column 1, line 21 - column 2, line 50 * * figures 1, 2 * [A] 9 [I] 3-6,8; | [XAI]DE4426074 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,10 * column 1, line 25 - column 3, line 8 * * figures 1-6 * [A] 7-9 [I] 3-5,11; | [A]WO2004018759 (E G O CONTROL SYSTEMS GMBH & C [DE], et al) [A] 1,17 * page 3, line 21 - page 5, line 9 ** figures 1-6 * |