EP3279692 - DATA PROCESSING DEVICE, SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR VERIFYING PERFORMANCE OF A SPECIFIED FUNCTION OF A POSITION DETERMINATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toll Collect GmbH Linkstrasse 4 10785 Berlin / DE | [2018/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Olitzsch, Christian Berliner Str. 5 16321 Bernau / DE | 02 /
Slizewski, Zbigniew Korsörer Str. 2 10437 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Chojnicki, Krzystof Kiautschoustr. 6 13353 Berlin / DE | 04 /
Mietsch, Andreas Rosenthaler Weg 17 13127 Berlin / DE | [2018/06] | Application number, filing date | 16001712.5 | 01.08.2016 | [2018/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3279692 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3279692 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01S19/01, G01S19/20, G01S19/40, G07B15/06, G01S19/14, G01S19/34 | [2018/06] | CPC: |
G01S19/14 (EP);
G01S19/40 (EP,US);
G07B15/063 (EP);
G01C21/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/37] |
Former [2018/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DATENVERARBEITUNGSEINRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR PRÜFUNG DER ERFÜLLUNG DER BESTIMMUNGSGEMÄSSEN FUNKTION EINER POSITIONSBESTIMMUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [2018/06] | English: | DATA PROCESSING DEVICE, SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR VERIFYING PERFORMANCE OF A SPECIFIED FUNCTION OF A POSITION DETERMINATION DEVICE | [2018/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNEES, SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE CONTROLE DE REALISATION DE LA FONCTION CONFORME D'UN DISPOSITIF DE DETERMINATION DE POSITION | [2018/06] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/37] | 23.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 11.10.2023 | DK | 11.10.2023 | EE | 11.10.2023 | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | IT | 11.10.2023 | LT | 11.10.2023 | LV | 11.10.2023 | NL | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SE | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | BG | 11.01.2024 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | PT | 12.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 11.10.2023 | |
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 11.10.2023 | |
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 11.10.2023 | |
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 11.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014278838 (NOVAK KEVIN MARK [US]) [X] 1-3,8,10,12,13 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0031]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0053]; figure 3 * [I] 9; | [A]EP2811466 (TOLL COLLECT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [XI]EP2924662 (KAPSCH TRAFFICCOM AG [AT]) [X] 1-5,7-14 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0017] * [I] 6,11,15 |