EP3135453 - CLOSURE LID AND INJECTION MOULD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Andreas Stihl AG & Co. KG Badstrasse 115 71336 Waiblingen / DE | [2017/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zimmermann, Helmut Biberstr. 3 D-73663 Berglen / DE | [2017/09] | Representative(s) | Reinhardt, Annette, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner mbB Menzelstraße 40 70192 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/09] | Application number, filing date | 16001723.2 | 03.08.2016 | [2017/09] | Priority number, date | DE20151011207 | 26.08.2015 Original published format: DE102015011207 | [2017/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3135453 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/26, B29C45/44, B65D43/02 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
B29C45/2622 (EP,CN,US);
B29C45/2628 (EP,US);
B29C45/44 (EP,US);
B65D41/04 (CN);
B65D41/0442 (US);
B65D43/0225 (EP,US);
B65D51/16 (EP,US);
B65D51/28 (US);
B29C2045/4485 (US);
B29L2031/565 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSSDECKEL UND SPRITZGIESSFORM ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2017/09] | English: | CLOSURE LID AND INJECTION MOULD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2017/09] | French: | COUVERCLE DE FERMETURE ET MOULE DE MOULAGE PAR INJECTION POUR SA PRODUCTION | [2017/09] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/09] | 11.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2322447 (GFV VERSCHLUSSTECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0044] * [I] 7-15; | [XI]DE102010029586 (GFV VERSCHLUSSTECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0042] , [0 45] - [0049] * * paragraphs [0008] - [0011] - [0 19] * * Bezugsz. 12, 24;; figures 1-11 * [I] 9-15; | [XI]US4953728 (MEEK JOHN R [US]) [X] 1-5,13-15 * abstract * * column 2 * * column 4 - column 6 * [I] 6-12; | [A]DE2619066 (GEYER & CO) [A] 1-15 * page 4 - page 7; figures 1-2 *; | [A]DE102013207002 (POLYTEC PLASTICS GERMANY GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * page 2 - page 7; figures 1-5; claims 1-12 *; | [A]WO2008102229 (SACMI [IT], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 4-10; claims 1-39 *; | [A]US3584111 (ALLISON BLAINE M) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]DE2215317 (EYELET SPECIALTY CO) [A] 1-15 * page 4 - page 6; figures 1-5; claims 1-4 *; | [A]DE4305138 (NOVEMBAL SA [FR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | US4721220 |