EP3156091 - DEVICE FOR MONITORING A DISCONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2021 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Löwenstein Medical Technology S.A. 18, rue Robert Stümper 2557 Luxembourg / LU | [2017/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adametz, Benjamin Heinrich-Plett-Str. 31 22609 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Tiemann, Björn Eulenkrugpfad 12 22359 Hamburg / DE | [2017/16] | Representative(s) | Marx, Thomas Löwenstein Medical Technology GmbH + Co. KG IP Management Kronsaalsweg 40 22525 Hamburg / DE | [2017/16] | Application number, filing date | 16002136.6 | 05.10.2016 | [2017/16] | Priority number, date | DE20151012930 | 07.10.2015 Original published format: DE102015012930 | [2017/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3156091 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3156091 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/00, // A61M39/10 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
A61M16/0051 (EP,US);
A61M16/026 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0027 (EP,US);
A61M2016/003 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0039 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0042 (EP,US);
A61M2039/1005 (EP,US);
A61M2205/14 (EP,US);
A61M2205/15 (EP,US);
A61M2205/18 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3334 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3365 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/47] |
Former [2017/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINER DISKONNEKTION | [2017/16] | English: | DEVICE FOR MONITORING A DISCONNECTION | [2017/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE D'UNE DÉCONNEXION | [2017/16] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/16] | 25.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2017/16] | 12.10.2017 | Examination requested [2017/47] | 13.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/05] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 20.12.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.01.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 20.12.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.01.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.10.2016 | AL | 26.02.2020 | CY | 26.02.2020 | CZ | 26.02.2020 | DK | 26.02.2020 | EE | 26.02.2020 | ES | 26.02.2020 | FI | 26.02.2020 | HR | 26.02.2020 | IT | 26.02.2020 | LT | 26.02.2020 | LV | 26.02.2020 | MC | 26.02.2020 | MK | 26.02.2020 | MT | 26.02.2020 | PL | 26.02.2020 | RO | 26.02.2020 | RS | 26.02.2020 | SE | 26.02.2020 | SI | 26.02.2020 | SK | 26.02.2020 | SM | 26.02.2020 | TR | 26.02.2020 | BG | 26.05.2020 | NO | 26.05.2020 | GR | 27.05.2020 | IS | 26.06.2020 | PT | 19.07.2020 | IE | 05.10.2020 | LU | 05.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 05.10.2016 | |
AL | 26.02.2020 | ||
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
IE | 05.10.2020 | ||
LU | 05.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 05.10.2016 | |
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MT | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
TR | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
IE | 05.10.2020 | ||
LU | 05.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
IE | 05.10.2020 | ||
LU | 05.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
LU | 05.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
LU | 05.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
NO | 26.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0968020 (NELLCOR PURITAN BENNETT INC [US]) [X] 1-16 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0032] *; | [X]US2004016431 (PREVEYRAUD LAURENT [FR]) [X] 1-16 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0033] *; | [X]US2006086357 (SOLIMAN IHAB S [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * figures 1-16 * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0054] *; | [X]US2010071696 (JAFARI MEHDI M [US]) [X] 1-16 * figures 1-10 ** paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0148] *; | [X]WO2014030098 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1-16 * figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0037] *; | [X]US2015144130 (O'DONNELL KEVIN PETER [NZ], et al) [X] 1-16 * figures 1-11 * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0134] * | by applicant | - UHL RR; LEWIS FJ, "Digital computer calculation of human pulmonary mechanics using a least squares fit technique", COMPUT BIOMED RES., (197410), vol. 7, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1016/0010-4809(74)90027-5, pages 489 - 95, XP022956645 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0010-4809(74)90027-5 | - GUTTMANN J; EBERHARD L; FABRY B, "Determination of volume-dependent respiratory system mechanics in mechanically ventilated patients using the new SLICE method", TECHNOL HEALTH CARE, (1994), vol. 2, pages 175 - 91 |