EP3182694 - INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2017/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mitsumoto, Shinichi c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2017/25] | Representative(s) | WESER & Kollegen Patentanwälte PartmbB Radeckestraße 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/25] | WESER & Kollegen Radeckestraße 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16002529.2 | 29.11.2016 | [2017/25] | Priority number, date | JP20150243510 | 14.12.2015 Original published format: JP 2015243510 | [2017/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3182694 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232, H04N5/247, H04N5/222 | [2017/25] | CPC: |
H04N5/222 (EP,US);
H04N7/181 (CN);
H04N21/21805 (US);
H04N21/2187 (US);
H04N21/816 (US);
H04N21/854 (US);
H04N23/611 (EP,US);
H04N23/66 (CN);
H04N23/69 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/06] |
Former [2017/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2017/25] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2017/25] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2017/25] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/06] | 26.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5850352 (MOEZZI SAIED [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 30, line 32 - column 47, line 20 ** figures 16a-16b *; | [Y]US2005018045 (THOMAS GRAHAM ALEXANDER [GB], et al) [Y] 2,3,12,13,15,16 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0106] * * figures 4,6 *; | [Y]US2014192204 (GLAZER YARIV [US]) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0045] * * figure 4 *; | [XYI]WO2015087172 (PLAYSIGHT INTERACTIVE LTD [IL]) [X] 1,4-7,10,11,14 * page 1, line 1 - line 34 * * page 12, line 9 - page 20, line 22 * * figures 2,3A,3B,4 * [Y] 2,3,9,10,12,13,15,16 [I] 8; | [YA] - YASUO ARIKI ET AL, "Automatic Production System of Soccer Sports Video by Digital Camera Work Based on Situation Recognition", PROCEEDINGS / ISM 2006, EIGHTH IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MULTIMEDIA : 11 - 13 DECEMBER 2006, SAN DIEGO, CA, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, LOS ALAMITOS, CALIF. [U.A.], (20061201), ISBN 978-0-7695-2746-8, pages 851 - 860, XP031041884 [Y] 9 * the whole document * [A] 6-8 | by applicant | JP2014215828 |