EP3175729 - SKI BOOT INCLUDING AN OPTIMISED SOLUTION TO ATTACHING THE PADS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Salomon S.A.S. 14 Chemin des Croiselets ZA des Croiselets 74370 Metz-Tessy / FR | [2017/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marechal, Pierre-Alexis 312 Rue des Genevriers 74330 Poisy / FR | 02 /
Couderc, Bernard 7 Rue Eugène Burgat-Charvillon 74000 Annecy / FR | [2017/23] | Application number, filing date | 16002555.7 | 01.12.2016 | [2017/23] | Priority number, date | FR20150002521 | 03.12.2015 Original published format: FR 1502521 | [2017/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3175729 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A43B5/04, A43B13/30, A43B13/36, F16B25/00 | [2017/23] | CPC: |
A43B13/30 (EP);
A43B13/36 (EP);
A43B5/0421 (EP);
A43B5/0496 (EP);
F16B37/005 (EP);
F16B25/0015 (EP);
F16B37/041 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SKISCHUH, DER EINE OPTIMIERTE LÖSUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG VON KUFEN EINSCHLIESST | [2017/23] | English: | SKI BOOT INCLUDING AN OPTIMISED SOLUTION TO ATTACHING THE PADS | [2017/23] | French: | CHAUSSURE DE SKI INCLUANT UNE SOLUTION OPTIMISÉE DE FIXATION DES PATINS | [2017/23] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/24] | 22.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2829187 (ROSSIGNOL LANGE SRL [IT]) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR933199 (ROBY ETS) [Y] 1-11 * page 1, column 2, lines 47-50 *; | [A]WO2009003904 (OBER ALP SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 2, line 17; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US2002088146 (JOSEPH MARK [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0081]; figure 2 *; | [T] - SIMAF, "Vis autotaraudeuse pour matières plastiques", (20061020), internet - PDF, URL: http://simaf.eu/PDF_FR/cata/polyplast_cata.pdf, (20160705), XP002759486 [T] 1,2 | by applicant | EP2829187 |