EP3318350 - METHOD FOR THE GENERATIVE PRODUCTION OF A THREE-DIMENSIONAL COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Klosterhofstrasse 1 80331 München / DE | For all designated states Airbus Defence and Space GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Straße 1 82024 Taufkirchen / DE | [2018/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foret, Pierre Bauerstr. 5 80796 München / DE | 02 /
Bauer, Dominik Herzog-Heinrich-Straße 11 80336 München / DE | [2018/19] | Representative(s) | Gellner, Bernd Linde GmbH Intellectual Property EMEA Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/19] | Gellner, Bernd Linde AG Technology & Innovation Corporate Intellectual Property Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | Application number, filing date | 16020428.5 | 02.11.2016 | [2018/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3318350 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B22F3/105, G01N27/407, G01N30/88 | [2018/19] | CPC: |
B22F10/28 (EP,US);
B22F10/20 (US);
B22F10/32 (EP,US);
B22F12/90 (EP,US);
B23K26/1224 (US);
B23K26/144 (US);
B29C64/153 (US);
B33Y10/00 (US);
B33Y30/00 (US);
B33Y40/00 (EP,US);
B33Y50/02 (US);
G01N27/407 (EP,US);
G01N30/88 (EP,US);
B01D2253/1122 (US);
B01D2257/104 (US);
B22F10/30 (US);
B22F2999/00 (EP,US);
B23K26/342 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F10/20, B22F2203/03 (US);
B22F2999/00, B22F10/28, B22F12/90, B22F2203/03 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR GENERATIVEN FERTIGUNG EINES 3-DIMENSIONALEN BAUTEILS | [2018/19] | English: | METHOD FOR THE GENERATIVE PRODUCTION OF A THREE-DIMENSIONAL COMPONENT | [2018/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE D'UN COMPOSANT TRIDIMENSIONNEL | [2018/19] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/19] | 19.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS60157085 (TOSHIBA KK) [Y] 1-8 * page 587 - page 589 * * figure 2 *; | [X]US2016045981 (ZURECKI ZBIGNIEW [US], et al) [X] 9 * paragraphs [0026] - [0029] * * figure 1 * * claim 13 *; | [Y]US2016067779 (DAUTOVA LYUTSIA [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0011] - [0018] * * figure 2 *; | [X]WO2016062714 (RENISHAW PLC [GB]) [X] 9 * page 4, line 25 - page 6, line 31 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP3075470 (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1-9* the whole document * |