EP3193282 - PROXIMITY INTEGRATED CIRCUIT CARD AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2017/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rizkalla, Shrief Technische Universitaet Wien, Institute of Telecommunications Gusshausstr.25/389 1040 Wien / AT | 02 /
Mecklenbraeuker, Christoph Friedrich Technische Universitaet Wien, Institute of Telecommunications Gusshausstr.25/389 1040 Wien / AT | 03 /
Prestros, Ralph Christian Josef Oskar NXP Semiconductors, Intell. Property & Licensing Red Central 60 High Street Redhill, Surrey RH1 1SH / GB | [2017/29] | Representative(s) | Hardingham, Christopher Mark NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Group Abbey House 25 Clarendon Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/29] | Hardingham, Christopher Mark NXP SEMICONDUCTORS Intellectual Property Group Abbey House 25 Clarendon Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16150859.3 | 12.01.2016 | [2017/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3193282 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077 | [2017/29] | CPC: |
G06K19/07754 (EP);
G06K19/07756 (EP);
G06K19/07783 (EP);
G06K19/07794 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NÄHENINTEGRIERTE CHIPKARTENSCHALTUNG UND VERFAHREN | [2017/29] | English: | PROXIMITY INTEGRATED CIRCUIT CARD AND METHOD | [2017/29] | French: | CARTE DE CIRCUIT INTÉGRÉ DE PROXIMITÉ ET PROCÉDÉ | [2017/29] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/30] | 08.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1031939 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-4,7-14 * figures 2,3 * * paragraphs [0039] - [0066] *; | [I]US2015257266 (MURAYAMA HIROMI [JP], et al) [I] 5-13,15 * figures 3,4 * * paragraphs [0059] , [0060] * | by applicant | - A. R. LOPEZ, "Review of Narrowband Impedance-Matching Limitations", IEEE ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATIONS MAGAZINE, (200408), vol. 46, doi:doi:10.1109/MAP.2004.1374015, pages 88 - 90, XP011124519 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MAP.2004.1374015 | - R. M. FANO, "Theoretical Limitations on the Broadband Matching of Arbitrary Impedances", JOURNAL OF THE FRANKLIN INSTITUTE, (195001), vol. 249 |