EP3096373 - LIQUID ELECTROLYTE LITHIUM ACCUMULATOR AND A METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polivka, Jaroslav Vilimovska 21 Prague 6 16000 Prague / CZ | [2016/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/47] | Representative(s) | Hak, Roman Hak, Janecek & Svestka Patent and Trademark Attorneys U Pruhonu 5 170 00 Praha 7 / CZ | [2016/47] | Application number, filing date | 16151081.3 | 13.01.2016 | [2016/47] | Priority number, date | CZ20150000335 | 20.05.2015 Original published format: CZ 20150335 | CZ20150000932 | 22.12.2015 Original published format: CZ 20150932 | [2016/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3096373 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/10, H01M2/36, H01M2/38, H01M4/04, H01M10/04, H01M10/42, H01M2/34, H01M2/40, H01M4/139, H01M10/052, H01M10/0583, H01M10/54 | [2016/47] | CPC: |
H01M4/043 (EP);
H01M10/0413 (EP);
H01M10/0431 (EP);
H01M10/4214 (EP);
H01M50/691 (EP);
H01M50/70 (EP);
H01M10/052 (EP);
H01M10/0583 (EP);
H01M10/54 (EP);
H01M2200/00 (EP);
H01M4/139 (EP);
H01M50/581 (EP);
H01M50/77 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP);
Y02W30/84 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LITHIUMAKKUMULATOR MIT FLÜSSIGEM ELEKTROLYT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2016/47] | English: | LIQUID ELECTROLYTE LITHIUM ACCUMULATOR AND A METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME | [2016/47] | French: | ACCUMULATEUR AU LITHIUM À ÉLECTROLYTE LIQUIDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELUI-CI | [2016/47] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/47] | 03.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4812375 (FOSTER DONALD L [US]) [A] 9 * claim 1 *; | [A]US6461762 (YANG CHANG-RUNG [TW], et al) [A] 9* figure 3 *; | [Y]JP2003123736 (JAPAN STORAGE BATTERY CO LTD) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0018] , [0021] - [0024]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2013005135 (HE3DA SRO [CZ], et al) [A] 8 * claim 1 *; | [YA]JP5341156B (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 1-8 * figure 3 * [A] 9 | by applicant | WO2010031363 | EP2619836 |