EP3057036 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ACCELERATING A VEHICLE AT START AT A LIGHT SIGN ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2016/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pascheka, Patrick Willem de Zwijgerlaan 12 2582 EN Den Haag / NL | 02 /
Kleinau, Sandra 1777 Am Ochsenberg 29 38531 Rötgesbüttel / DE | [2016/37] |
Former [2016/33] | 01 /
Pascheka, Patrick VW AG, 1524 Hagenring 18 38106 Braunschweig / DE | ||
02 /
Kleinau, Sandra 1777 Am Ochsenberg 29 38531 Rötgesbüttel / DE | Application number, filing date | 16152021.8 | 20.01.2016 | [2016/33] | Priority number, date | DE201510202451 | 11.02.2015 Original published format: DE102015202451 | [2016/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3057036 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, B60W30/095, B60W30/18, B60W40/04, B60W50/00, B60W30/165 | [2016/33] | CPC: |
B60W30/18154 (EP,CN,US);
B60W40/10 (CN);
B60W10/04 (CN);
B60W30/14 (CN);
B60W30/162 (CN);
B60W30/165 (EP,CN,US);
B60W30/17 (CN);
B60W30/18027 (EP,US);
B60W30/18145 (EP,US);
B60W40/04 (EP,CN,US);
B60W50/0097 (EP,US);
G08G1/09623 (EP,US);
G08G1/09626 (EP,US);
G08G1/096725 (EP,US);
G08G1/096783 (EP,US);
G08G1/096791 (EP,US);
G08G1/22 (EP,US);
B60W2554/00 (CN);
B60W2554/4041 (EP,CN,US);
B60W2554/80 (CN);
B60W2555/60 (EP,CN,US);
B60W2556/50 (CN);
B60W2720/10 (CN);
B60W2720/106 (EP,US);
B60W2754/30 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/13] |
Former [2016/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESCHLEUNIGUNG EINES FAHRZEUGS BEIM START AN EINER LICHTZEICHENANLAGE | [2016/33] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ACCELERATING A VEHICLE AT START AT A LIGHT SIGN ASSEMBLY | [2016/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE D'ACCELERATION D'UN VEHICULE AU DEMARRAGE A UN FEU DE CIRCULATION | [2016/33] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/13] | 30.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE102011081609 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [I]WO2013034729 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE], et al); | [A]US8478500 (VAHIDI ARDALAN [US], et al); | [IDY]DE102012202110 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) | by applicant | DE102009042923 | DE102012202110 |