EP3032922 - ELECTRONIC CONTROL TO REGULATE POWER FOR SOLID-STATE LIGHTING AND METHODS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Express Imaging Systems, LLC 3600 Lind Avenue SW, Suite 140 Renton, Washington 98057 / US | [2018/20] |
Former [2016/24] | For all designated states Express Imaging Systems, LLC 3600 Lind Avenue SW, Suite 140 Seattle, WA 98118 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REED, William G. 9804 62nd Avenue South Seattle, WA Washington 98118 / US | [2016/24] | Representative(s) | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25-26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/38] | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | ||
Former [2016/24] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | Application number, filing date | 16152644.7 | 16.11.2009 | [2016/24] | Priority number, date | US20080115438P | 17.11.2008 Original published format: US 115438 P | US20090154619P | 23.02.2009 Original published format: US 154619 P | [2016/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3032922 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3032922 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
H05B45/48 (EP,US);
H05B45/3725 (EP,US);
H05B45/46 (US);
Y02B20/30 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] |
Former [2016/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE STEUERUNG ZUR REGULIERUNG DER LEISTUNG FÜR FESTKÖRPERBELEUCHTUNG UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2016/24] | English: | ELECTRONIC CONTROL TO REGULATE POWER FOR SOLID-STATE LIGHTING AND METHODS THEREOF | [2016/24] | French: | COMMANDE ÉLECTRONIQUE POUR RÉGULER LA PUISSANCE POUR UN ÉCLAIRAGE À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2016/24] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 04.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09826926.9 / EP2364575 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.11.2009 | AT | 19.09.2018 | CY | 19.09.2018 | CZ | 19.09.2018 | DK | 19.09.2018 | EE | 19.09.2018 | ES | 19.09.2018 | FI | 19.09.2018 | HR | 19.09.2018 | IT | 19.09.2018 | LT | 19.09.2018 | LV | 19.09.2018 | MC | 19.09.2018 | MK | 19.09.2018 | PL | 19.09.2018 | RO | 19.09.2018 | SE | 19.09.2018 | SI | 19.09.2018 | SK | 19.09.2018 | SM | 19.09.2018 | TR | 19.09.2018 | IE | 16.11.2018 | LU | 16.11.2018 | MT | 16.11.2018 | FR | 19.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | BG | 19.12.2018 | GB | 19.12.2018 | NO | 19.12.2018 | GR | 20.12.2018 | IS | 19.01.2019 | PT | 19.01.2019 | DE | 01.06.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/17] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IE | 16.11.2018 | ||
LU | 16.11.2018 | ||
MT | 16.11.2018 | ||
FR | 19.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GB | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
DE | 01.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
IE | 16.11.2018 | ||
LU | 16.11.2018 | ||
MT | 16.11.2018 | ||
FR | 19.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GB | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
DE | 01.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
IE | 16.11.2018 | ||
LU | 16.11.2018 | ||
FR | 19.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
GB | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
DE | 01.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
IE | 16.11.2018 | ||
LU | 16.11.2018 | ||
FR | 19.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
DE | 01.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
IE | 16.11.2018 | ||
LU | 16.11.2018 | ||
FR | 19.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
DE | 01.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
IE | 16.11.2018 | ||
LU | 16.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
LU | 16.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
LU | 16.11.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/12] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 19.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005243022 (NEGRU SORIN L [US]) [A] 12-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0052] * * figure 5 *; | [A]JP2005310997 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** figure 14 *; | [XA]US7081722 (HUYNH KIMLONG [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 51 - column 3, line 34 * * column 5, line 6 - column 5, line 25 * * column 6, line 12 - column 6, line 18 * * column 8, line 27 - column 8, line 25 * * column 9, line 41 - column 10, line 3 * * column 10, line 34 - column 11, line 40 * * figures 1, 2, 5, 8, 9 * [A] 5; | [A]US2006244396 (BUCUR CONSTANTIN [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 2 *; | [A]WO2007023454 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 4 *; | [A]WO2008034242 (TIR TECHNOLOGY LP [CA], et al) [A] 8 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0044] *; | [XI]US2008094000 (YAMAMOTO KENJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,9,12-15 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0064] * * figures 1, 2, 5-7 * [I] 3,8,10,11 |