EP3047878 - ASSEMBLY FOR PREVENTING THE SPREAD OF FIRE IN A BUILDING WITH AT LEAST ONE BUILDING WALL MADE OF WOOD BUILDING MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change - inventor | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wildeboer, Jürgen Marker Weg 17 26826 Weener / DE | [2024/30] |
Former [2021/47] | For all designated states Wildeboer, Werner Marker Weg 13 a 26826 Weener / DE | ||
Former [2016/30] | For all designated states Wildeboer, Werner Marker Weg 13 a 26826 Weener / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wildeboer, Werner 26826 Weener / DE | [2024/30] |
Former [2016/30] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [2021/47] |
Former [2016/30] | Jabbusch, Matthias Jabbusch Siekmann & Wasiljeff Patentanwälte Hauptstrasse 85 26131 Oldenburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 16152778.3 | 26.01.2016 | [2016/30] | Priority number, date | DE20152000505U | 26.01.2015 Original published format: DE 202015000505 U | [2016/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3047878 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3047878 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A62C2/12, F24F13/14, F16L5/04 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
A62C2/12 (EP);
F16L5/04 (EP);
F24F13/14 (EP);
F24F11/35 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/10] |
Former [2016/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUM VERHINDERN DER AUSBREITUNG EINES BRANDES IN EINEM GEBÄUDE, MIT ZUMINDEST EINER GEBÄUDEWAND AUS HOLZBAUSTOFFEN | [2016/30] | English: | ASSEMBLY FOR PREVENTING THE SPREAD OF FIRE IN A BUILDING WITH AT LEAST ONE BUILDING WALL MADE OF WOOD BUILDING MATERIALS | [2016/30] | French: | SYSTEME DESTINE A EMPECHER LA PROPAGATION D'UN INCENDIE DANS UN BATIMENT, COMPRENANT AU MOINS UNE PAROI DE BATIMENT EN BOIS | [2016/30] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/10] | 15.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.08.2022
25.08.2022
ADMISSIBLE TROX GmbH Heinrich-Trox-Platz 1 47506 Neukirchen-Vluyn / DE Opponent's representative Dr. Stark & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Moerser Straße 140 47803 Krefeld / DE | 02
24.08.2022
26.08.2022
ADMISSIBLE SCHAKO KG Steigstraße 25-27 78600 Kolbingen / DE Opponent's representative Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt Weiß, Arat & Partner mbB, et al, et al Zeppelinstraße 4 78234 Engen / DE | [2022/40] |
Former [2022/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.08.2022
25.08.2022
ADMISSIBLE TROX GmbH Heinrich-Trox-Platz 1 47506 Neukirchen-Vluyn / DE Opponent's representative Dr. Stark & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Moerser Straße 140 47803 Krefeld / DE | ||
02
24.08.2022
SCHAKO KG Steigstraße 25-27 78600 Kolbingen / DE Opponent's representative Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt Weiß, Arat & Partner mbB, et al, et al Zeppelinstraße 4 78234 Engen / DE | 08.09.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.01.2023 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.01.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.02.2024 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.02.2024 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 03.04.2024 | Appeal received No. T0382/24 | 03.04.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | 06.06.2024 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.03.2024 | Appeal received No. T0382/24 | 06.03.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | 22.05.2024 | Statement of grounds filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.01.2016 | AL | 24.11.2021 | CY | 24.11.2021 | EE | 24.11.2021 | HR | 24.11.2021 | IT | 24.11.2021 | LT | 24.11.2021 | LV | 24.11.2021 | MC | 24.11.2021 | MK | 24.11.2021 | PL | 24.11.2021 | RO | 24.11.2021 | RS | 24.11.2021 | SI | 24.11.2021 | SK | 24.11.2021 | SM | 24.11.2021 | IE | 26.01.2022 | LU | 26.01.2022 | FR | 31.01.2022 | BG | 24.02.2022 | GB | 24.02.2022 | GR | 25.02.2022 | IS | 24.03.2022 | PT | 24.03.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 26.01.2016 | |
AL | 24.11.2021 | ||
CY | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
IT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
IE | 26.01.2022 | ||
LU | 26.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
GB | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 26.01.2016 | |
AL | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
IT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
IE | 26.01.2022 | ||
LU | 26.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
GB | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
IT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
IE | 26.01.2022 | ||
LU | 26.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
GB | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
IE | 26.01.2022 | ||
LU | 26.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
GB | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
LU | 26.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
LU | 26.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
LU | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | EE | 24.11.2021 | |
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
LU | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | EE | 24.11.2021 | |
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | EE | 24.11.2021 | |
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 24.11.2021 | |
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | HR | 24.11.2021 | |
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | HR | 24.11.2021 | |
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | HR | 24.11.2021 | |
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | LT | 24.11.2021 | |
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 24.11.2021 | |
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 24.02.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE19714625 (CAPE BOARDS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [Y] 6,8,9 * column 1, line 53 - column 4, line 31 * * figure 1 * [A] 1-5,10-13; | [YA]DE10033306 (KAMLEITHNER MALY UTA [AT]) [Y] 7 * column 5, lines 5-17 * * column 6, lines 33-55 * * column 8, lines 13-22 * * column 13, line 58 - column 14, line 68 * * figure 8 * [A] 1-6,8-13; | [XY]AU2004203153 (HOLYOAKE INDUSTRIES LTD [NZ]) [X] 1,4,5,10,12,13 * page 1, lines 3-7 * * page 6, line 13 - page 7, line 26 * * page 8, lines 16-19 * * page 9, lines 2-24 * * page 10, line 24 - page 17, line 24 * * page 18, line 14 - page 21, line 19 * * figures 1a, 1b, 2b * [Y] 2,3,6-9,11; | [YA]DE202007013237U (STOCKER KAMINSYSTEME H STOCKER [AT]) [Y] 2,3,11 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraphs [0007] - [0016] * * paragraphs [0021] - [0025] * * figures 1, 2 * [A] 1,4-10,12,13; | [A]DE102007010682 (WILDEBOER WERNER [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraphs [0012] - [0014] * * paragraphs [0029] - [0031] ** figures 1, 2, 3a, 3b, 5a, 5b * | Opposition | AU2004203153 | DE102007010682 | - Anonymous, "Brandschutzklappe Serie FK-EU Montage-und Betriebsanleitung", Trox GmbH, (20141020), pages 1 - 84, XP055963917 | - Anonymous, "Muster-Richtlinie über brandschutztechnische Anforderungen an hochfeuerhemmende Bauteile in Holzbauweise - M-HFHHolzR (Fassung Juli 2004)1", DIBt Mitteilungen, (20040501), pages 161 - 168, XP055963933 | - Wichtermann, Karl-Heinz, "4.9.7.2 Brandschutz für Lüftungsleitungen // 4.9.7.3 Brandschutzklappe", Praxis der Gebäude- Energieberatung EnEV 2009; Reihe: Technik & Wirtschaft, Deiningen, Druckerei + Verlag Steinmeier, (20090101), pages 194 - 197, ISBN 978-3-87082-101-2, XP009552611 | - Reske, Matina ; Wildeboer, Jürgen ; Wildeboer, Werner, "Einbau", Brandschutzklappen : Konstruktion, Einbau, Verwendung, DE, [München] : Verl. Moderne Industrie, 2012, (20120101), pages 28 - 32, ISBN 978-3-86236-044-4, XP009552607 | - Wichtermann, Karl-Heinz, "4.9.7.2 Brandschutz für Lüftungsleitungen // 4.9.7.3 Brandschutzklappe", Wichtermann, Karl-Heinz, Dr. Karl-Heinz Wichtermann, Praxis der Gebäude- Energieberatung EnEV 2009; Reihe: Technik & Wirtschaft, Deiningen, Druckerei + Verlag Steinmeier, (20090101), pages 194 - 197, ISBN 978-3-87082-101-2, XP009552611 | - Dirk Bohne, "1.2 Trassen-und Leitungsführung", Dirk Bohne, Dirk Bohne, Technischer Ausbau von Gebäuden, 10. Auflage, Springer Vieweg, (20140101), pages 5 - 28, doi:10.1007/978-3-8348-2253-6, ISBN 978-3-8348-1832-4, XP009552612 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-8348-2253-6 | - "7.3 Holzskelettbau", Dietrich Neumann, Ulrich Weinbrenner, Ulf Hestermann, Ludwig Rongen, Frick/Knöll Baukonstruktionslehre 1, 34. Auflage, B.G. Teubner Verlag / GWV Fachverlage GmbH, Wiesbaden , (2006), pages 229 - 229, ISBN 3-8351-0001-7, XP009552610 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-8351-9121-1_7 |