EP3199360 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING PAPER PRINTABLE WITH INKJET FOR USE AS A DECOR PAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unilin, BV Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE | [2024/09] |
Former [2021/25] | For all designated states Flooring Industries Limited, SARL 10b, rue des Mérovingiens (Z.I. Bourmicht) 8070 Bertrange / LU | ||
Former [2020/43] | For all designated states Unilin, BV Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE | ||
Former [2017/31] | For all designated states Unilin, BVBA Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLEMENT, Benjamin Truweelstraat 4 B-8790 Waregem / BE | [2017/31] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/24] | Corradini, Lorenzo Marazzi Group S.r.l. Viale Regina Pacis, 39 41049 Sassuolo (MO) / IT | ||
Former [2017/31] | Schacht, Benny Marcel Corneel Unilin Industries, BVBA Patent Department Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE | Application number, filing date | 16152800.5 | 26.01.2016 | [2017/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3199360 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3199360 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/407, B41M5/50, B41M5/52, B44C5/04 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
B41M5/506 (EP,CN,US);
B41M5/502 (CN,KR,RU);
B41J3/407 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B41J11/0015 (EP,CN,US);
B41J11/002 (CN);
B41J2/01 (CN,KR);
B41M5/40 (CN,KR);
B41M5/44 (CN);
B41M5/443 (KR);
B41M5/508 (US);
B41M5/52 (EP,US);
B41M5/5218 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B41M5/5254 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
B44C5/04 (EP,CN,RU,US);
E04F15/02038 (EP);
E04F15/102 (EP);
B41M2205/38 (EP,CN,US);
B41M2205/42 (EP,CN,US);
E04F2201/0153 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] |
Former [2017/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MIT TINTENSTRAHLBEDRUCKBAREM PAPIER ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS DEKORPAPIER | [2017/31] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING PAPER PRINTABLE WITH INKJET FOR USE AS A DECOR PAPER | [2017/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE PAPIER IMPRIMABLE PAR JET D'ENCRE POUR UTILISATION COMME PAPIER DÉCORATIF | [2017/31] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/10] | 02.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21161721.2 / EP3871894 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.03.2023
16.03.2023
ADMISSIBLE Felix Schoeller Holding GmbH & Co. KG Burg Gretesch 49086 Osnabrück / DE Opponent's representative Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2023/16] | 27.03.2023 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.07.2023 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.11.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 15.06.2022 | AT | 15.06.2022 | CZ | 15.06.2022 | DK | 15.06.2022 | EE | 15.06.2022 | FI | 15.06.2022 | HR | 15.06.2022 | LT | 15.06.2022 | LV | 15.06.2022 | MC | 15.06.2022 | NL | 15.06.2022 | PL | 15.06.2022 | RO | 15.06.2022 | RS | 15.06.2022 | SE | 15.06.2022 | SI | 15.06.2022 | SK | 15.06.2022 | SM | 15.06.2022 | BG | 15.09.2022 | NO | 15.09.2022 | GR | 16.09.2022 | IS | 15.10.2022 | PT | 17.10.2022 | GB | 26.01.2023 | IE | 26.01.2023 | LU | 26.01.2023 | CH | 31.01.2023 | FR | 31.01.2023 | LI | 31.01.2023 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
GB | 26.01.2023 | ||
IE | 26.01.2023 | ||
LU | 26.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
FR | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
GB | 26.01.2023 | ||
LU | 26.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
FR | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
GB | 26.01.2023 | ||
LU | 26.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
LU | 26.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 15.06.2022 | |
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 15.06.2022 | |
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 15.06.2022 | |
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 15.06.2022 | |
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US6372329 (GRACZYK TOMASZ [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,9 * column 3, line 38 - column 11, line 50 * [Y] 7,10-13 [I] 14,15; | [XYI]GB2380695 (ILFORD IMAGING UK LTD [GB]) [X] 1-6,8,9 * page 3, line 2 - page 11, line 21 * [Y] 7,10-13 [I] 14,15; | [XAI]US2003219553 (GRAINDOURZE MARC [BE]) [X] 8,9 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0085] * [A] 1-7,10-13 [I] 14,15; | [XAYI]WO2007099281 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * page 4, line 15 - page 18, line 27 * [A] 8,9 [Y] 7,10-13 [I] 14,15; | [XAY]WO2009061351 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US], et al) [X] 1-6,14,15 * page 5, line 7 - page 40, line 17 * [A] 8,9 [Y] 7,10-13; | [XAYI]US2009219374 (KAIMOTO HIDEKI [JP]) [X] 1-6,14 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0265] * [A] 8,9 [Y] 7,10-13 [I] 15; | [XYI]EP2894047 (UNILIN BVBA [BE]) [X] 8-13 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0102]; figures 1-5 * [Y] 1-7 [I] 14,15; | [I]EP2905376 (AGFA GRAPHICS NV [BE], et al) [I] 1-15* paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0106]; figures 1-4 *; | [XDYI]WO2015118451 (UNILIN BVBA [BE], et al) [XD] 8-13 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0092]; figures 1-8 * [Y] 1-7 [I] 14,15 | by applicant | DE19725829 | EP1044822 | EP1290290 | EP1749676 | EP1857511 | EP1872959 | EP2132041 | EP2274485 | EP2293946 | WO2011124503 | EP2431190 | WO2015118451 | Opposition | EP1044822 | EP1493866 | JP2006045694 | - Borch Jens et al, "Handbook of Physical Testing of Paper Volume 2 Second Edition", Handbook of Physical Testing of Paper, (20010925), vol. 2, pages 290 - 293, XP093046506 |