EP3050774 - RAILWAY SYSTEMS USING ACOUSTIC MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Mobility Limited Euston House 24 Eversholt Street London, NW1 1AD / GB | [2020/08] |
Former [2019/10] | For all designated states Siemens Mobility Limited Faraday House Sir William Siemens Square Frimley, Camberley, Surrey GU16 8QD / GB | ||
Former [2016/31] | For all designated states Siemens Rail Automation Holdings Limited Faraday House Sir William Siemens Square Frimley, Camberley, Surrey GU16 8QD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chadwick, Simon Plum Tree Cottages Etchilhampton, Devizes, Wiltshire SN10 3JP / GB | 02 /
Chapman, Mike c/o Siemens Rail Automation Holings Limited Langley Park Pew Hill SN15 1JD Chippenham Wiltshire / DE | 03 /
Glover, Mark c/o Siemens Rail Automation Holings Limited Langley Park Pew Hill SN15 1JD Chippenham Wiltshire / DE | 04 /
McQuillan, James c/o Siemens Rail Automation Holings Limited Langley Park Pew Hill SN15 1JD Chippenham Wiltshire / DE | 05 /
Priest, Ian c/o Siemens Rail Automation Holings Limited Langley Park Pew Hill SN15 1JD Chippenham Wiltshire / DE | [2016/31] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/31] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16153126.4 | 03.09.2010 | [2016/31] | Priority number, date | GB20090015322 | 03.09.2009 Original published format: GB 0915322 | [2016/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3050774 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3050774 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP3050774 | Date: | 11.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B61L29/32, B61L25/02, B61L29/18, // B61L23/06 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
B61L1/06 (EP);
B61L29/32 (US);
B61L23/041 (EP);
B61L25/021 (US);
B61L25/025 (US);
B61L27/53 (US);
B61L27/57 (EP);
B61L29/18 (US);
G08B13/1672 (EP);
B61L23/06 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/11] |
Former [2016/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | EISENBAHNSCHIENENSYSTEME MIT AKUSTISCHER ÜBERWACHUNG | [2016/31] | English: | RAILWAY SYSTEMS USING ACOUSTIC MONITORING | [2016/31] | French: | SYSTÈMES FERROVIAIRES UTILISANT UNE SURVEILLANCE ACOUSTIQUE | [2016/31] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/11] | 12.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 06.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10752138.7 / EP2473392 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.09.2018
13.09.2018
ADMISSIBLE OptaSense Holdings Limited Cody Technology Park Ively Road Farnborough Hampshire GU14 0LX / GB Opponent's representative Leonard-Pugh, Eurion QinetiQ Ltd Intellectual Property Department Malvern Technology Centre St Andrew's Road Malvern, Worcestershire WR14 3PS / GB | [2018/42] | 27.09.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.01.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.01.2020 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.02.2020 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.02.2020 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 04.08.2020 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.09.2010 | AL | 13.12.2017 | CY | 13.12.2017 | CZ | 13.12.2017 | DK | 13.12.2017 | EE | 13.12.2017 | FI | 13.12.2017 | HR | 13.12.2017 | IT | 13.12.2017 | LT | 13.12.2017 | LV | 13.12.2017 | MC | 13.12.2017 | MK | 13.12.2017 | NL | 13.12.2017 | PL | 13.12.2017 | PT | 13.12.2017 | RO | 13.12.2017 | SI | 13.12.2017 | SK | 13.12.2017 | SM | 13.12.2017 | TR | 13.12.2017 | BG | 13.03.2018 | NO | 13.03.2018 | GR | 14.03.2018 | IS | 13.04.2018 | IE | 03.09.2018 | LU | 03.09.2018 | MT | 03.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 03.09.2010 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MK | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
IE | 03.09.2018 | ||
LU | 03.09.2018 | ||
MT | 03.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 03.09.2010 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
IE | 03.09.2018 | ||
LU | 03.09.2018 | ||
MT | 03.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
IE | 03.09.2018 | ||
LU | 03.09.2018 | ||
MT | 03.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
IE | 03.09.2018 | ||
LU | 03.09.2018 | ||
MT | 03.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
IE | 03.09.2018 | ||
LU | 03.09.2018 | ||
MT | 03.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
IE | 03.09.2018 | ||
LU | 03.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
IE | 03.09.2018 | ||
LU | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
LU | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
IT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/26] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
NO | 13.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004071839 (GEN ELECTRIC [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 5, paragraph l - page 6, paragraph 2 *; | [A]DE102007041174 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0017] *; | [A]DE102007006833 (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023] *; | [A]WO2009043109 (UNITED GROUP RAIL SERVICES LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 8, paragraph 1 - paragraph 4 * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO9725235 (PACE JOSEPH A [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 9, line 14 - line 17 * * page 25, line 14 - line 26 * | by applicant | GB20100007073 | Opposition | EP1902923 |