EP3199597 - SHOP PRIMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jotun A/S P.O. Box 2021 3202 Sandefjord / NO | [2017/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THVEDT, Thor JOTUN A/S P.O. Box P.O. Box 2021 3202 Sandefjord / NO | 02 /
UNDRUM, Håvard JOTUN A/S P.O. Box P.O. Box 2021 3202 Sandefjord / NO | [2017/31] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/31] | Campbell, Neil Boyd Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 16153504.2 | 29.01.2016 | [2017/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3199597 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/00 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
C09D5/00 (EP,RU);
C09D5/106 (KR,RU,US);
C09D5/12 (KR,RU,US);
C08K3/08 (US);
C09D183/04 (KR,RU,US);
C09D5/084 (KR,RU,US);
C09D7/70 (RU,US);
C09D7/80 (US);
C08K2003/0812 (US);
C08K2003/0893 (US);
C08K2003/2241 (US);
C08K2003/2296 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FERTIGUNGSBESCHICHTUNG | [2017/31] | English: | SHOP PRIMER | [2017/31] | French: | COUCHE DE PEINTURE PRIMAIRE | [2017/31] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/31] | 14.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5246488 (TANAKA MASATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-15* examples in column 4 ff. *; | [X]EP1191074 (SIGMA COATINGS BV [NL]) [X] 1-15 * examples 1 + 2 *; | [X]WO03022940 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-15 * examples 1-8 *; | [X]WO2008128932 (AKZO NOBEL COATINGS INT BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-15 * examples page 18 ff. *; | [X]US2013143034 (IIJIMA MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * examples 1 and 2 *; | [X]WO2013116004 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [X] 1-15 * examples in Table 1 * | by applicant | US4767726 | US5580371 | US5883029 | US6468336 | US2011268899 | US2014106176 |