EP3203344 - VALVE, IN PARTICULAR HEAT EXCHANGER VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danfoss A/S Nordborgvej 81 6430 Nordborg / DK | [2017/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sigurdsson, Haraldur Nordre Strandvej 53,1 8240 Risskov / DK | 02 /
Hølck, Poul Saloparken 215 8300 Odder / DK | [2017/32] | Representative(s) | Knoblauch, Andreas Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch PartGmbB Reuterweg 51-53 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2017/32] | Application number, filing date | 16153766.7 | 02.02.2016 | [2017/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3203344 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G05D7/01, F16K47/16, F24D19/10 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
G05D7/0133 (EP);
F24D19/1018 (EP,US);
F16K1/04 (EP);
F16K1/06 (EP);
F16K1/52 (EP);
F16K47/12 (EP);
F16K47/16 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VENTIL, INSBESONDERE WÄRMETAUSCHERVENTIL | [2017/32] | English: | VALVE, IN PARTICULAR HEAT EXCHANGER VALVE | [2017/32] | French: | SOUPAPE, NOTAMMENT SOUPAPE D'ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR | [2017/32] | Examination procedure | 16.08.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2014138566 (CAPRERA BRIAN J [US]) [Y] 2-8,10,13,14* Paragraphs [0028], [0029], [0032], figures 2B, 4C, 4D, 5A, 6A, 6B *; | [XYI]EP2977847 (DANFOSS AS [DK]) [X] 1,9,12 * Paragraphs [0001], [0025], [0026], [0031], [0038] * [Y] 2-8,10,13,14 [I] 11 |