EP3048444 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ESTIMATION OF INTRA-KEROGEN POROSITY OF DOWNHOLE FORMATION SAMPLES FROM PYROLYSIS TESTS AND BASIN MODELING DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 10200 Bellaire Boulevard Houston, TX 77072 / US | [2016/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALFORD, James, E. 3311 Ashmont Lane Missouri City, TX Texas 77459 / US | [2016/30] | Representative(s) | Turner, Craig Robert AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/30] | Turner, Craig Robert A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | Application number, filing date | 16153950.7 | 27.12.2012 | [2016/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3048444 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/24 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
G01N33/241 (EP,US);
E21B44/005 (US);
E21B47/07 (US);
E21B49/00 (US);
G05B17/00 (US);
G06F17/10 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/30] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DER INTRA-KEROGEN-POROSITÄT VON BOHRLOCHFORMATIONSPROBEN AUS PYROLYSETEST- UND BECKENMODELLIERUNGSDATEN | [2016/30] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ESTIMATION OF INTRA-KEROGEN POROSITY OF DOWNHOLE FORMATION SAMPLES FROM PYROLYSIS TESTS AND BASIN MODELING DATA | [2016/30] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET MÉTHODES PERMETTANT D'ESTIMER LA POROSITÉ INTRA-KÉROGÈNE D'ÉCHANTILLONS PROVENANT D'UN PUITS/D'UNE FORMATION À PARTIR DE TESTS DE PYROLYSE ET DE DONNÉES DE MODELAGE DU BASSIN | [2016/30] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/30] | 07.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/30] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12821089.5 / EP2939019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - MODICA CHRISTOPHER J., LAPIERRE SCOTT G., "Estimation of kerogen porosity in source rocks as a function of thermal transformation: example from the Mowry shale in the Powder river basin of Wyoming", AAPG BULLETIN, (20120131), vol. 96, no. 1, doi:10-1306/04111110201, pages 87 - 108, XP008164182 [I] 1-7 * abstract * * page 91, column right, paragraph 2 - page 101, column right, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1306/04111110201 | [A] - Cosentino Luca, "Rock properties distribution", Integrated reservoir studies: Chapter 4 - Rock properties, Institut Français du Pétrole, (20011231), pages 144 - 146, ISBN 978-2-7108-0797-1, XP055279933 [A] 1-7 * page 145, paragraph 3 - page 146, paragraph 2 * * figure 4.36 * |