EP3090858 - DOUBLE-HEAD CUTTING SAW WITH AUTOMATIC PROCESSING FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/45] | WELDING METHOD FREE OF BEAD TRIMMING AND DOUBLE-HEAD CUTTING SAW WITH AUTOMATIC PROCESSING FUNCTION | ||
[2018/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taicang Wegoma Machinery Co., Ltd. No. 87 East of Suzhou Road Taicang Jiangsu 215400 / CN | [2016/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Haitao No. 87 East of Suzhou Rd Taicang, Jiangsu 215400 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Zhilong No. 87 East of Suzhou Rd. Taicang, Jiangsu 215400 / CN | 03 /
DONG, Ming No. 87 East of Suzhou Rd. Taicang, Jiangsu 215400 / CN | [2016/45] | Representative(s) | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25-26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/27] | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | ||
Former [2016/45] | Walsh, Marie Goretti, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | Application number, filing date | 16154241.0 | 04.02.2016 | [2016/45] | Priority number, date | CN201510169463 | 13.04.2015 Original published format: CN201510169463 | [2016/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3090858 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3090858 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3090858 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B23C3/00, B23C3/12, B23C3/30, B23D45/04, B23D45/14, B23Q39/02, B29C65/02, E06B3/96 | [2017/11] | CPC: |
B29C66/1162 (EP);
B23C3/002 (EP);
B23C3/128 (EP);
B23C3/305 (EP);
B23D45/046 (EP);
B23D45/143 (EP);
B29C65/02 (EP);
B29C66/02241 (EP);
B29C66/322 (EP);
B29C66/5241 (EP);
B29C66/5243 (EP);
B29C66/52431 (EP);
B29C66/71 (EP);
B29C66/72523 (EP);
B29C66/73921 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2027/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/45] | B29C65/02, E06B3/96, B23C3/12, B23C3/00, B23C3/30, B23Q39/02, B23D45/02, B23D45/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/45] | Title | German: | DOPPELKOPFSCHNITTSÄGE MIT AUTOMATISCHER VERARBEITUNGSFUNKTION | [2018/04] | English: | DOUBLE-HEAD CUTTING SAW WITH AUTOMATIC PROCESSING FUNCTION | [2018/04] | French: | SCIE DE COUPE À DOUBLE TÊTE AVEC FONCTION DE TRAITEMENT AUTOMATIQUE | [2018/04] |
Former [2016/45] | SCHWEISSVERFAHREN FREI VON WULSTBESCHNEIDUNG UND DOPPELKOPFSCHNITTSÄGE MIT AUTOMATISCHER VERARBEITUNGSFUNKTION | ||
Former [2016/45] | WELDING METHOD FREE OF BEAD TRIMMING AND DOUBLE-HEAD CUTTING SAW WITH AUTOMATIC PROCESSING FUNCTION | ||
Former [2016/45] | PROCÉDÉ DE SOUDURE EXEMPTE DE ROGNAGE ET SCIE DE COUPE À DOUBLE TÊTE AVEC FONCTION DE TRAITEMENT AUTOMATIQUE | Examination procedure | 04.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/45] | 14.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.02.2016 | AL | 04.07.2018 | AT | 04.07.2018 | CY | 04.07.2018 | CZ | 04.07.2018 | DK | 04.07.2018 | EE | 04.07.2018 | ES | 04.07.2018 | FI | 04.07.2018 | HR | 04.07.2018 | IT | 04.07.2018 | LT | 04.07.2018 | LV | 04.07.2018 | MC | 04.07.2018 | MK | 04.07.2018 | NL | 04.07.2018 | RO | 04.07.2018 | RS | 04.07.2018 | SE | 04.07.2018 | SI | 04.07.2018 | SK | 04.07.2018 | SM | 04.07.2018 | TR | 04.07.2018 | BG | 04.10.2018 | NO | 04.10.2018 | GR | 05.10.2018 | IS | 04.11.2018 | PT | 04.11.2018 | IE | 04.02.2019 | LU | 04.02.2019 | MT | 04.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | FR | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 04.02.2016 | |
AL | 04.07.2018 | ||
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CY | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 04.11.2018 | ||
IE | 04.02.2019 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
MT | 04.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CY | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 04.11.2018 | ||
IE | 04.02.2019 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
MT | 04.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 04.11.2018 | ||
IE | 04.02.2019 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
MT | 04.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
IE | 04.02.2019 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
IE | 04.02.2019 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
IE | 04.02.2019 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 04.07.2018 | |
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 04.07.2018 | |
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 04.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007199187 (OHMORI HITOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 2-5 * abstract * * figures 5,8,9,10 * * paragraphs [0071] - [0127] *; | [A]WO2010133910 (EMMEGI SPA [IT], et al) [A] 2-5 * abstract * * figures 1,2,6 *; | [A]US2012060662 (HINSHAW FOSTER D [US], et al) [A] 2-5 * abstract * * figures 1-24 ** paragraphs [0040] - [0052] *; | [I]WO2013132406 (GRAF SYNERGY SRL [IT], et al) [I] 1 * abstract * * figures 1-8c * * page 1, lines 1-15 * * page 2, line 21 - page 18, line 31 *; | [A]CN203356728U (TAICANG WEGOMA MACHINERY CO) [A] 2-5 * figures 1-5 *; | [I]WO2014118728 (GRAF SYNERGY SRL [IT], et al) [I] 1 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * * page 2, line 19 - page 15, line 7 * |