EP3068141 - METHOD AND HEARING AID FOR FREQUENCY-DEPENDENT NOISE SUPPRESSION IN AN INPUT SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/37] | METHOD FOR FREQUENCY-DEPENDENT NOISE SUPPRESSION IN AN INPUT SIGNAL | ||
[2019/16] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.07.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sivantos Pte. Ltd. 18 Tai Seng Street No. 08-08 18 Tai Seng Singapore 539775 / SG | [2018/08] |
Former [2016/37] | For all designated states Sivantos Pte. Ltd. Block 28, Ayer Rajah Crescent, No 06-08 Singapore 139959 / SG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PUDER, Henning Heuweg 27 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2016/37] | Representative(s) | FDST Patentanwälte Nordostpark 16 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2016/37] | Application number, filing date | 16155814.3 | 16.02.2016 | [2016/37] | Priority number, date | DE201510204253 | 10.03.2015 Original published format: DE102015204253 | [2016/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3068141 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/10, // G10L21/0216, G10L21/0232 | [2016/37] | CPC: |
H04R1/1083 (EP,US);
H04B15/005 (CN);
H04R25/505 (US);
H04R25/00 (CN);
H04R25/353 (US);
H04R25/407 (US);
G10L2021/02166 (EP,US);
G10L21/0232 (EP,US);
H04R2225/43 (EP,US);
H04R2430/03 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/13] |
Former [2016/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND HÖRGERÄT ZUR FREQUENZABHÄNGIGEN RAUSCHUNTERDRÜCKUNG EINES EINGANGSSIGNALS | [2019/16] | English: | METHOD AND HEARING AID FOR FREQUENCY-DEPENDENT NOISE SUPPRESSION IN AN INPUT SIGNAL | [2019/16] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL AUDITIF DE SUPPRESSION DU BRUIT D'UN SIGNAL D'ENTREE EN FONCTION DE LA FREQUENCE | [2019/16] |
Former [2016/37] | VERFAHREN ZUR FREQUENZABHÄNGIGEN RAUSCHUNTERDRÜCKUNG EINES EINGANGSSIGNALS | ||
Former [2016/37] | METHOD FOR FREQUENCY-DEPENDENT NOISE SUPPRESSION IN AN INPUT SIGNAL | ||
Former [2016/37] | PROCEDE DE SUPPRESSION DU BRUIT D'UN SIGNAL D'ENTREE EN FONCTION DE LA FREQUENCE | Examination procedure | 16.02.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/13] | 29.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.04.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/09] | 09.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4630304 (BORTH DAVID E [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8 * column 1, lines 13-24 * * column 3, line 36 - column 6, line 30; figures 1 - 3 *; | [XY]US5027410 (WILLIAMSON MALCOLM J [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8 * column 1, line 5 - line 54; figure 1 * * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 55 * * column 7, line 58 - column 8, line 59; figure 2 * * column 13, line 33 - line 58; figure 8 * [Y] 5-7; | [X]DE68926930T (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [X] 1-4,8 * page 1 - page 5; figures 1, 4, 5 *; | [A]US6580798 (SCHAUB ARTHUR [CH]) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [Y]US2010158158 (MENU MICHEL [FR], et al) [Y] 5 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0028] - [0062]; figures 1 - 3B *; | [Y]WO2014085978 (UNIV NORTHWESTERN POLYTECHNIC [CN]) [Y] 6,7 * paragraphs [0002] - [0008] - [0020] - [0046]; figures 2, 3 * |