EP3043320 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMPRESSION OF 3D COMPUTER GRAPHICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2016/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWATA, Eiji c/o SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT INC. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
SUZUOKI, Masakazu c/o SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT INC. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2016/28] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2021/46] |
Former [2016/28] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16155839.0 | 25.04.2003 | [2016/28] | Priority number, date | US20020167328 | 11.06.2002 Original published format: US 167328 | [2016/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3043320 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3043320 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06T9/00, H04N19/20, H04N19/51, H04N19/57 | [2016/28] | CPC: |
H04N19/51 (EP,US);
G06T9/00 (KR);
G06T1/20 (KR);
G06T7/20 (KR);
G06T9/001 (EP,US);
H04N19/20 (EP,US);
H04N19/57 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/09] |
Former [2016/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KOMPRIMIERUNG VON 3D-RECHNERGRAFIKEN | [2016/28] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMPRESSION OF 3D COMPUTER GRAPHICS | [2016/28] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMPRESSION D'INFOGRAPHIE 3D | [2016/28] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/09] | 04.01.2018 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 05.02.2018 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 19.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03717726.8 / EP1495641 | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 16.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 16.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 19 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.04.2003 | AT | 17.11.2021 | CY | 17.11.2021 | CZ | 17.11.2021 | DK | 17.11.2021 | EE | 17.11.2021 | ES | 17.11.2021 | FI | 17.11.2021 | IT | 17.11.2021 | MC | 17.11.2021 | NL | 17.11.2021 | RO | 17.11.2021 | SE | 17.11.2021 | SI | 17.11.2021 | SK | 17.11.2021 | TR | 17.11.2021 | BG | 17.02.2022 | GR | 18.02.2022 | PT | 17.03.2022 | IE | 25.04.2022 | LU | 25.04.2022 | BE | 30.04.2022 | CH | 30.04.2022 | FR | 30.04.2022 | LI | 30.04.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 25.04.2003 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CY | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
IT | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
IE | 25.04.2022 | ||
LU | 25.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 25.04.2003 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
IT | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
IE | 25.04.2022 | ||
LU | 25.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
IT | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
IE | 25.04.2022 | ||
LU | 25.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
IE | 25.04.2022 | ||
LU | 25.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
LU | 25.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
LU | 25.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
LU | 25.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 17.02.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0675462 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 5, lines 15-47; figure 4; claim 2 *; | [X]JPH08305895 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US5786860 (KIM MIN-KYU [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 5, lines 22-55 * * column 8, line 28 - column 9, line 39 *; | [A]EP0989563 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0124] - [0129]; figures 38-40 *; | [A] - ZHAOHUI SUN ET AL, "Parametric motion modeling based on trilinear constraints for object-based video compression", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 1998. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1998 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SEATTLE, WA, USA 12-15 MAY 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980512), vol. 5, doi:10.1109/ICASSP.1998.678053, ISBN 978-0-7803-4428-0, pages 2593 - 2596, XP010279367 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1998.678053 | [A] - YOON I ET AL, "Compression of computer graphics images with image-based rendering", MULTIMEDIA COMPUTING AND NETWORKING. PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, XX, XX, (19990125), vol. 3654, pages 66 - 75, XP002247634 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - WITTEBROOD R B ET AL, "REAL-TIME RECURSIVE MOTION SEGMENTATION OF VIDEO DATA ON A PROGRAMMABLE DEVICE", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20010831), vol. 47, no. 3, doi:10.1109/30.964146, ISSN 0098-3063, pages 559 - 567, XP002263797 [A] 1-15 * pages 560-561, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.964146 |