EP3059854 - VARIABLE-SPEED OPERATION CONTROL APPARATUS AND HYDROELECTRIC POWER GENERATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2016/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mori, Junji c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K.K.Toshiba) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
Nakazono, Masahiko c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K.K.Toshiba) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 03 /
Osada, Oki c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K.K.Toshiba) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato- ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 04 /
Shiozaki, Yuichi c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K.K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 05 /
Asano, Takeyoshi c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K.K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2022/16] |
Former [2016/34] | 01 /
Osada, Oki c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K.K.Toshiba) 1-1, Shinaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | ||
02 /
Shiozaki, Yuichi c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K.K.Toshiba) 1-1, Shinaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | |||
03 /
Asano, Takeyoshi c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K.K.Toshiba) 1-1, Shinaura 1-chome, Minato- ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | |||
04 /
Mori, Junji c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K.K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | |||
05 /
Nakazono, Masahiko c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K.K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Östra Storgatan 7 553 21 Jönköping / SE | [2022/16] |
Former [2016/34] | Awapatent AB Östra Storgatan 7 553 21 Jönköping / SE | Application number, filing date | 16156134.5 | 17.02.2016 | [2016/34] | Priority number, date | JP20150033302 | 23.02.2015 Original published format: JP 2015033302 | [2016/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3059854 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3059854 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F03B15/00 | [2021/48] | CPC: |
F03B15/00 (EP,US);
H02P9/48 (US);
F03B13/08 (US);
H02J3/38 (EP,US);
H02K7/1823 (US);
H02P1/52 (EP,US);
H02P27/00 (EP,US);
H02P9/42 (EP,US);
F05B2270/327 (EP,US);
Y02E10/20 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/34] | H02P9/42, H02P27/00, H02P1/52, H02J3/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/34] | Title | German: | STUFENLOSES BETRIEBSSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON STROM AUS WASSERKRAFT | [2016/34] | English: | VARIABLE-SPEED OPERATION CONTROL APPARATUS AND HYDROELECTRIC POWER GENERATION SYSTEM | [2016/34] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT À VITESSE VARIABLE ET SYSTÈME DE GÉNÉRATION D'ÉNERGIE HYDROÉLECTRIQUE | [2016/34] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/34] | 22.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.11.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 20.04.2022 | AT | 20.04.2022 | CZ | 20.04.2022 | DK | 20.04.2022 | EE | 20.04.2022 | ES | 20.04.2022 | FI | 20.04.2022 | HR | 20.04.2022 | IT | 20.04.2022 | LT | 20.04.2022 | LV | 20.04.2022 | MC | 20.04.2022 | NL | 20.04.2022 | PL | 20.04.2022 | RO | 20.04.2022 | RS | 20.04.2022 | SE | 20.04.2022 | SI | 20.04.2022 | SK | 20.04.2022 | SM | 20.04.2022 | BG | 20.07.2022 | NO | 20.07.2022 | GR | 21.07.2022 | IS | 20.08.2022 | PT | 22.08.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2023/44] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 20.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005073550 (VOITH SIEMENS HYDRO POWER [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [IP]WO2015028663 (ABB TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [IP] 1-9* the whole document *; | [XI] - SUUL J A ET AL, "Wind power integration in isolated grids enabled by variable speed pumped storage hydropower plant", SUSTAINABLE ENERGY TECHNOLOGIES, 2008. ICSET 2008. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20081124), ISBN 978-1-4244-1887-9, pages 399 - 404, XP031442202 [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-8 | [I] - Jon Are Suul, Kjetil Uhlen, Member, IEEE, Tore Undeland, Fellow, IEEE, "Variable speed pumped storage hydropower forintegration of wind energy in isolated grids case description and control strategies", (20080609), URL: https://aaltodoc.aalto.fi/bitstream/handle/123456789/800/urn011517.pdf?sequence=1&isAllowed=y, (20160714), XP002759904 [I] 1-9 * the whole document * | [XI] - H. Schlunegger and A. Thöni, "100 MW full-size converter in theGrimsel 2 pumped-storage plant", (20130101), URL: http://www.grimselstrom.ch/home/download/1291, (20160714), XP002759905 [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-9 | Examination | FR2561718 |