EP3057116 - A HYBRID SOLAR CELLS INTEGRATED GLASSBLOCK AND PRESTRESSED PANEL MADE OF DRY-ASSEMBLED GLASSBLOCKS FOR THE CONSTRUCTION OF TRASLUCENT BUILDING ENVELOPES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corrao, Rossella Via Ponte di Mare 91 90100 Palermo / IT | For all designated states Pastore, Luisa Via Monti Iblei 31 90100 Palermo / IT | For all designated states Morini, Marco Via G. A. Cesareo 52 90100 Palermo / IT | [2016/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORRAO, Rossella Via Ponte di Mare, 91 I-90100 PALERMO / IT | 02 /
PASTORE, Luisa Via Monti Iblei, 31 I-90100 PALERMO / IT | 03 /
MORINI, Marco Via G. A. Cesareo, 52 I-90100 PALERMO / IT | 04 /
GARRAFFA, Alessandra Via S. Giovanni di Dio, 11 I-90100 PALERMO / IT | 05 /
GIAMBANCO, Giuseppe Salita Sant'Antonio, 19 I-90100 PALERMO / IT | 06 /
TRAPANI, Giuseppe Via Principe di Pantelleria, 37 I-90100 PALERMO / IT | [2016/33] | Representative(s) | Chimini, Francesco Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria 11 25122 Brescia / IT | [2016/33] | Application number, filing date | 16156774.8 | 05.03.2013 | [2016/33] | Priority number, date | IT2012PA00002 | 06.03.2012 Original published format: IT PA20120002 | IT2012PA00003 | 06.03.2012 Original published format: IT PA20120003 | [2016/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3057116 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01G9/20, E04C1/42, E04C2/54 | [2016/33] | CPC: |
E04C1/42 (EP,US);
H01G9/2059 (US);
E04C2/546 (EP,US);
H01G9/2077 (EP,US);
Y02B10/10 (EP,US);
Y02E10/542 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/13] |
Former [2016/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | IN HYBRIDE SOLARZELLEN INTEGRIERTER GLASBLOCK UND VORGESPANNTE TAFEL AUS ZUSAMMENGESETZTEN TROCKENEN GLASBLÖCKEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG LICHTDURCHSICHTIGER GEBÄUDEAUSSENWÄNDE | [2016/33] | English: | A HYBRID SOLAR CELLS INTEGRATED GLASSBLOCK AND PRESTRESSED PANEL MADE OF DRY-ASSEMBLED GLASSBLOCKS FOR THE CONSTRUCTION OF TRASLUCENT BUILDING ENVELOPES | [2016/33] | French: | BLOC DE VERRE AVEC CELLULES SOLAIRES HYBRIDES INTÉGRÉES ET PANNEAU PRÉCONTRAINT CONSTITUÉ DE BLOCS DE VERRE ASSEMBLÉS À SEC POUR LA CONSTRUCTION D'ENVELOPPES TRANSLUCIDES DE BÂTIMENTS | [2016/33] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/13] | 20.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/24] | 26.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/24] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13722576.9 / EP2823498 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2004055288 (MUSZYNSKI ARKADIUSZ [PL]) [Y] 1-4,7,9,10,12-15 * page 4, line 17 - page 7, line 19; figures 1,2,7,17 *; | [Y]US2004177577 (VOEGELE WILLIAM P [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,7,9,10,12-15 * paragraphs [0042] - [0061]; figures 1, 2a-2f, 3a *; | [Y]EP2065531 (SAVE SRL [IT]) [Y] 3,4,7,9,10,12-15 * the whole document *; | [Y] - ANDERS HAGFELDT ET AL, "Dye-Sensitized Solar Cells", CHEMICAL REVIEWS, (20101110), vol. 110, no. 11, doi:10.1021/cr900356p, ISSN 0009-2665, pages 6595 - 6663, XP055029250 [Y] 3,4,7,9,10,12-15 * page 6595 - page 6663 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cr900356p | by applicant | US5010704 | JPH05230899 |