EP3062039 - STIRLING REFRIGERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Twinbird Corporation 2084-2 Aza-Katamukai Yoshida-Nishiota Tsubame-shi Niigata 959-0292 / JP | [2016/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Takeshi c/o Twinbird Corporation 2084-2 Aza-Katamukai Yoshida-Nishiota Tsubame-shi, Niigata 9590292 / JP | 02 /
INOUE, Mineyuki c/o Twinbird Corporation 2084-2 Aza-Katamukai Yoshida-Nishiota Tsubame-shi, Niigata 9590292 / JP | 03 /
TANIKAWA, Jun c/o Twinbird Corporation 2084-2 Aza-Katamukai Yoshida-Nishiota Tsubame-shi, Niigata 9590292 / JP | [2016/35] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2016/35] | Application number, filing date | 16157607.9 | 26.02.2016 | [2016/35] | Priority number, date | JP20150036985 | 26.02.2015 Original published format: JP 2015036985 | [2016/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3062039 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F25B9/14, F02G1/043 | [2016/35] | CPC: |
F25B9/14 (EP,US);
F25B31/023 (US);
F28D1/0226 (US);
F28D15/0275 (US);
F25B2309/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] |
Former [2016/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STIRLING-KÄLTEMASCHINE | [2016/35] | English: | STIRLING REFRIGERATOR | [2016/35] | French: | RÉFRIGÉRATEUR STIRLING | [2016/35] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/09] | 23.02.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1164278 (TSUIN BADO KOGYO KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5,11 * column 4 - column 6; figure 1 * [I] 3,6-10; | [A]US2004089012 (CHEN WEI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11* page 2 - page 6; figure 3 *; | [XI]US2004163388 (YAMAGIRI TSUNEO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0032]; figure 1 * [I] 3,6-11 | by applicant | JP3769751B |