EP3072823 - CONTAINER TREATMENT ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krones Aktiengesellschaft Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2016/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WINZINGER, Frank Böhmerwaldstr. 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2016/39] | Representative(s) | Benninger, Johannes Benninger Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr.-Leo-Ritter-Strasse 5 93049 Regensburg / DE | [2016/39] | Application number, filing date | 16157922.2 | 27.09.2012 | [2016/39] | Priority number, date | DE20111054890 | 28.10.2011 Original published format: DE102011054890 | [2016/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3072823 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B65C9/00, B67C3/22, B29C49/42, B29C49/78, B65B59/04 | [2016/39] | CPC: |
B29C31/006 (EP,US);
A61L2/26 (US);
B23Q3/15526 (US);
B29C49/36 (US);
B29C49/42 (EP,US);
B29C49/4252 (EP,US);
B29C49/6463 (US);
B29C49/78 (EP,US);
B65B59/00 (EP,US);
B65B59/001 (EP,US);
B65B59/02 (US);
B65B59/04 (EP,US);
B65C9/0062 (EP,US);
B67C3/22 (EP,US);
A61L2202/10 (US);
B23Q2003/15537 (US);
B23Q3/15503 (EP,US);
B23Q3/15539 (US);
B23Q3/15573 (US);
B29C2049/4856 (EP);
B29C2049/4858 (US);
B65B55/08 (EP);
B65B55/10 (EP);
B67C2003/221 (EP,US);
Y10T483/138 (EP,US);
Y10T483/165 (EP,US);
Y10T483/17 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] |
Former [2016/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BEHÄLTERBEHANDLUNGSANLAGE | [2016/39] | English: | CONTAINER TREATMENT ASSEMBLY | [2016/39] | French: | INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT DE RECIPIENT | [2016/39] | Examination procedure | 29.02.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/18] | 03.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/47] | 23.06.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.07.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/47] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12770073.0 / EP2771245 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE20000417U (KHS MASCH & ANLAGENBAU AG [DE]) [X] 1,4-6,9,11,13,14 * the whole document * [I] 2,7,8,12; | [A]DE102007025521 (KHS AG [DE]) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [I]EP2292402 (KRONES AG [DE]) [I] 1-6,9-11,13,14 * the whole document *; | [XI]EP2306255 (KRONES AG [DE]) [X] 1,4-6,9,11,13,14 * the whole document * [I] 7,8 | by applicant | DE4242925 | EP0985633 |