EP3213801 - ROTARY DYNAMIC SIMULATION DEVICE AND AUDIOVISUAL APPARATUS USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brogent Technologies Inc. No. 9, Fuxing 4th Road Qianzhen District Kaohsiung City 806 / TW | [2017/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAI, Deng-Horng 15F-1, No.260, Jung-shang 2nd Rd. Kaohsiung 806 / TW | 02 /
CHIEN, Ke-Cheng 15F-1, No.260, Jung-shang 2nd Rd. Kaohsiung 806 / TW | 03 /
HUANG, Cheng-Lin 15F-1, No. 260, Jung-shan 2nd Rd. Kaohsiung 806 / TW | [2018/25] |
Former [2017/36] | 01 /
LAI, Deng-Horng 15F-1, No.260, Jung-shang 2nd Rd. 806 Kaohsiung / TW | ||
02 /
CHIEN, Ke-Cheng 15F-1, No.260, Jung-shang 2nd Rd. 806 Kaohsiung / TW | |||
03 /
HUANG, Cheng-Lin 15F-1, No. 260, Jung-shan 2nd Rd. 806 Kaohsiung / TW | Representative(s) | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft mbB Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2017/36] | Application number, filing date | 16158058.4 | 01.03.2016 | [2017/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3213801 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3213801 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A63G31/16, G09B9/14 | [2017/36] | CPC: |
A63G31/16 (EP);
A63J25/00 (EP);
G09B9/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/36] | Title | German: | ROTIERENDE DYNAMISCHE SIMULATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND AUDIOVISUELLE VORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2017/36] | English: | ROTARY DYNAMIC SIMULATION DEVICE AND AUDIOVISUAL APPARATUS USING THE SAME | [2017/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SIMULATION DYNAMIQUE ROTATIF ET APPAREIL AUDIOVISUEL UTILISANT CELUI-CI | [2017/36] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/36] | 13.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 09.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.03.2016 | AL | 20.06.2018 | CY | 20.06.2018 | CZ | 20.06.2018 | EE | 20.06.2018 | HR | 20.06.2018 | LT | 20.06.2018 | LV | 20.06.2018 | MC | 20.06.2018 | MK | 20.06.2018 | RO | 20.06.2018 | RS | 20.06.2018 | SI | 20.06.2018 | SK | 20.06.2018 | SM | 20.06.2018 | BG | 20.09.2018 | GR | 21.09.2018 | PT | 22.10.2018 | IE | 01.03.2019 | LU | 01.03.2019 | MT | 01.03.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 01.03.2016 | |
AL | 20.06.2018 | ||
CY | 20.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
PT | 22.10.2018 | ||
IE | 01.03.2019 | ||
LU | 01.03.2019 | ||
MT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
CY | 20.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
PT | 22.10.2018 | ||
IE | 01.03.2019 | ||
LU | 01.03.2019 | ||
MT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
PT | 22.10.2018 | ||
IE | 01.03.2019 | ||
LU | 01.03.2019 | ||
MT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IE | 01.03.2019 | ||
LU | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
LU | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | CZ | 20.06.2018 | |
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | CZ | 20.06.2018 | |
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CZ | 20.06.2018 | |
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 20.06.2018 | |
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | HR | 20.06.2018 | |
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | HR | 20.06.2018 | |
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | HR | 20.06.2018 | |
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | LT | 20.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3469837 (HEILIG MORTON L) [A] 1-4,7,8,10* Figure 17 and corresponding passages in the description *; | [A]US5192247 (BARR CRAIG K [US], et al) [A] 1,7-10 * column 3, line 33 - column 5, line 42; figure - *; | [A]US2005014567 (LI MING [CN], et al) [A] 7,8 * abstract *; | [A]US2012258810 (LAI DENG-HORNG [TW], et al) [A] 1,7-9,11 * paragraphs [0018] - [0023]; figure - *; | [A]WO2012144690 (ENTUS CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1,7,8 * paragraphs [0017] - [0058]; figure - *; | [A]US2015030999 (LEE JONG CHAN [KR], et al) [A] 1,4-6 * paragraphs [0082] - [0109]; figures 13-18 *; | [A]US2015157951 (LEE JONG CHAN [KR], et al) [A] 1,4-6 * paragraphs [0042] - [0089]; figure - * |