EP3064225 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CLEANING AND/OR DISINFECTING THE AIR OF ENCLOSED AND/OR CONFINED SPACES INTENDED TO BE USED BY PERSONS AND/OR ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Menotti, Dario Via Santa Caterina, 14 24043 Caravaggio (BG) / IT | [2016/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/36] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [2016/36] | Application number, filing date | 16158115.2 | 01.03.2016 | [2016/36] | Priority number, date | IT2015MI00307 | 02.03.2015 Original published format: IT MI20150307 | [2016/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3064225 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/22, A61L9/14, B05B3/10 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
A61L2/22 (EP);
A61L9/14 (EP);
B05B3/1014 (EP);
A61L2202/11 (EP);
A61L2202/15 (EP);
A61L2202/16 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM REINIGEN UND/ODER DESINFIZIEREN DER LUFT IN GESCHLOSSENEN UND/ODER BEGRENZTEN RÄUMEN ZUR VERWENDUNG DURCH PERSONEN UND/ODER TIERE | [2016/36] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CLEANING AND/OR DISINFECTING THE AIR OF ENCLOSED AND/OR CONFINED SPACES INTENDED TO BE USED BY PERSONS AND/OR ANIMALS | [2016/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR NETTOYER ET/OU DÉSINFECTER DE L'AIR D'ESPACES CONFINÉS ET/OU FERMÉS DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ PAR DES PERSONNES ET/OU DES ANIMAUX | [2016/36] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/40] | 19.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2007084650 (SCHWEI MARK C [US], et al) [X] 1,5,7-10 * paragraphs [0010] - [0012] - [0014] , [0015] , [0027] - [0036] - [0053] , [0056] , [0058]; figure -; claim - * [Y] 2,3,11,12 [I] 4,6; | [XYI]EP0958864 (SCHIA LORENZO [IT]) [X] 1,5,7,10 * paragraphs [0009] - [0012] - [0014] , [0017] - [0020] - [0024] - [0026] - [0030]; figure -; claim - * [Y] 2,3,11,12 [I] 4,6,9; | [XYI]US4179900 (CORRIGAN JOHN E [US]) [X] 1,4,7-10 * column 1, lines 19-49 * * column 2, line 63 - column 6, line 29; figure -; claim - * [Y] 2,3,11,12 [I] 5,6; | [XDI]US2011123394 (PLANTINGA PAUL [NL], et al) [XD] 7 * paragraphs [0004] , [0020] , [0021] , [0037] - [0046] - [0048] , [0050] , [0058] - [0061]; figure -; claim - * [I] 1,4-6,8-10; | [I]WO2013188930 (WILLOCX FILIP WILLEM MARIA [BE], et al) [I] 1,4-7 * page 8, line 28 - page 10, line 21 * * page 11, line 23 - page 14, line 11; figure -; claim - *; | [Y]US2011104005 (DA ROCHA COSTA ALINE MARIA [BR]) [Y] 2,3 * paragraphs [0015] , [0050] - [0054]; claim - *; | [Y]US2010189599 (BOBBERT ILJA [NL]) [Y] 2,3 * paragraphs [0064] , [0 70] , [0071] , [0087] - [0091] *; | [Y]GB1515511 (BALS E) [Y] 11,12 * page 1, line 46 - page 2, line 92; figure -; claim - *; | [Y]US4221332 (BALS EDWARD J) [Y] 11,12 * column 1, line 45 - column 3, line 29; figure .; claim - *; | [Y]GB2026904 (BALS EDWARD JULIUS) [Y] 11,12 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5557848 (POVEY GRAHAM S [GB]) [Y] 11,12 * column 4, line 27 - column 5, line 28; figure -; claim - * | by applicant | US2011123394 |